Council | 02/16/2024 | Resolution R25-0424, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001679 | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0424 | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/30/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 01/25/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0519 | ||
Council | 01/24/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 11/10/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0519 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Council | 11/01/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |