District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0526 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/02/2023

                            MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
November 2, 2023
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of 
the District of Co lumbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mende lson: 
In accordance 
with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. 
Law 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 47-2853.06(d), 
I am pleased to nominate the following person for r
eappointment:  
Mr. Michael Johnson 
Sherier Place, NW 
Washington, DC 20016 
(Ward 3 ) 
as a plumber licensed in the District member of the Board of Industrial Trades, f
or a term to end 
June 26, 2026. 
Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-	mentioned 
nominee, together with a proposed 
resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation 
process.  
I
 would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. 
Please do not 
hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
airman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
15 To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Michael Johnson as a member of the Board of 
16 Industrial Trades. 
17 
18 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
19 resolution may be cited as the "Board of Industrial Trades Michael Johnson Confirmation 
20 Resolution of 2023 ". 
21 
22 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: 
23 	Mr. Michael Johnson 
24 	Sherier Place, NW 
25 	Washington, DC 20016 
26 	(Ward 3) 
27 
28 as a plumber licensed in the District member 	of the Board of Industrial Trades, established by 
29 D.C. Official Code§ 47-2853.06(d), for a term to end June 26, 2026. 
30 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
31 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 	of the Mayor. 
32 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  PROFILE
Pipe Dreams Plumbing & Heating, Inc is a full service plumbing and hydronic heating company servicing
DC and surrounding areas. We specialize in all types of plumbing from simple faucet installation to high-
end installations. Pipe Dreams was established in 1994, after many years of work experience in the field.
We are licensed, insured and bonded. In addition to licenses/certifications listed below, I am also an active
member of WSMPA and PHCC.
LICENSES/CERTIFICATIONS
Master Plumbing license 1202, District of Columbia
Master Plumbing license 50210, State of Maryland
Master Plumbing license 2705032524, State of Virginia
Licensed to do business in Alexandria, Arlington and Fairfax
DC Plumbing Apprenticeship Program (1985-1989); Washington Gas Installation of Two PSI Copper
Houselines (1989); Trak Pipe Certification (1990); Backflow Certification (1991); Pex Piping Certification
(2002); Residential Boiler Training (2007); Viega Pro Radiant Training (2011)
EXPERIENCE
Pipe Dreams Plumbing & Heating, Inc • Established in 1994 — Present
Michael Johnson, President/Owner
JH Peterson Plumbing and Well Pumps • 1990-1994 
Service mechanic and earned Masters licences
HD Johnson Plumbing & Heating, Inc • 1985-1990 • 202-244-6555
Began as apprentice plumber, learned the trade and became a supervisor.
PROFESSIONAL REFERENCES
Ron White, DC Plumbing inspector, 202-478-5781
Dave Johnson III, Owner, HD Johnson Plumbing & Heating, 202-244-6555
Frank Gaines, retired DC Plumbing inspector, 202-437-7151
CLIENT REFERENCES
Richard Levy, The Levy Group, Georgetown, DC 202-337-5000
Richard Zantsinger, Mauch, Zantzinger and Associates, Palisades, DC 202-363-8501
David Jones, David Jones Architects, Northwest, DC 202-332-1200
Additional references available upon request
P.O. BOX 685  GLEN ECHO, MD 20812  301 946-9348
PLUMBING & HEATING, INC April 2018
To Whom it May Concern:
As the owner of Pipe Dreams Plumbing & Heating, I have vast experience in many areas of residential and
commercial construction.  I have been plumbing for over 33 years and in business for myself for almost 25,
mostly in Northwest DC, Montgomery County and Northern Virginia. 
In addition to running Pipe Dreams I also take on home renovation contracting. Among my projects are a
Sears home renovation in DC. I have successfully financed and renovated homes in Silver Spring, DC and
built a home in Colonial Beach, VA from the ground up. 
As a born and raised DC resident, I have many years working with the government. I know the city well
and have many contacts on which I rely. I am involved with professional associations (WSMPA, PHCC)
and my community (Palisades Georgetown Lions Club, The Palisades Community Church).
Regards,
Michael B. Johnson
P.O. BOX 685  GLEN ECHO, MD 20812  301 946-9348
PLUMBING & HEATING, INC  
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
Michael Johnson 
 
Michael Johnson is the owner of Pipe Dreams Plumbing and 
Heating, INC, and is a current member of the Board of Industrial 
Trades. 
 
He began his path in plumbing at Edison Career Center while in 
high school. During that time he signed up for IT at the VoTech 
program but there weren’t enough interested participants, so he 
transferred into the plumbing class. Mr. Johnson immediately 
found that he had a skill in the field and earned the Student 
Plumber of the Year for the class. After graduation	, he began as a 
full-time plumber’s helper. With more training in various classes and programs he quickly 
moved up the ladder and eventually became a mechanic. After several years with HD Johnson 
Plumbing and Heating, he 	moved to JH Peterson Plumbing and Well Pumps, where he learned 
additional skills and rose to the level of Master Plumber.  
 
After several years at JH Peterson Plumbing, Mr. Johnson found that he had the necessary 
education and knowledge to go out on his own and began Pipe Dreams Plumbing and Heating, 
Inc. Mr. Johnson has had this company for over two decades. He specializes in high end-
residential renovations and repairs.  
 
A Ward 3 resident, Mr. Johnson has his master plumbing license in Washington, D.C., 
Maryland, and Virginia. 
  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724 -7681 
 
To:   Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   June 26, 2023 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Garth Grannum, Alex 	Lemu, 
Michael Johnson, Khidhar Abdulshakur, Gregory Kinyard, Jr., William H. Satterwhite III, and Cliffton Tamorria as members of the Board of Industrial Trades 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  	If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 	202-724-1303, or me at 202-	724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 	Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish