LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
District Of Columbia DC
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Council
Bills
PR25-0537
Action History
DC
District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0537
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session
District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0537
Action History
Council
01/26/2024
Resolution R25-0401, Effective from Jan 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001028
Council
01/09/2024
Approved with Resolution Number R25-0401
Council
01/09/2024
Final Reading, CC
Council
11/24/2023
Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0537 Published in the DC Register
Council
11/21/2023
Retained by the Council
Council
11/21/2023
Introduced in Office of the Secretary