District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0547 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 12/05/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-365 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
December 5, 2023 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to continue existing requirements for providers of commercial or residential rental 
property to abide by agreed upon rent payment plans with eligible tenants. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 
may be cited as the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) During the COVID-19 pandemic, the Council created protections and 
procedural changes to address the widespread ramifications of the public health emergency and 
its aftermath. The District removed the initial COVID-19 public health emergency in July 
2021. The Coronavirus Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2021, effective June 24, 2021 
(D.C. Law 24-9; 68 DCR 4824) (“Temporary Act”), which contained many of the longer-term 
protective measures, expired on February 4, 2022. 
(b) For commercial and residential tenants, provisions in the Temporary Act provided 
that their rental provider were required to offer a rent payment plan for eligible tenants 
between March 11, 2020, and July 25, 2022. The payment plans had to have a minimum term 
length of one year, unless otherwise agreed upon by the tenant and provider, during which time 
providers could not report to credit reporting agencies as delinquent any payments made under 
an agreed upon plan. The Temporary Act also required providers to retain tenant payment plan 
applications for at least 3 years. 
(c) The Council passed two rounds of emergency and temporary legislation to ensure 
continuity in the law for tenants whose payment plans are not yet complete and to uphold the 
requirement that providers retain payment plan application records for at least 3 years.  
(d) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted a third round of emergency legislation, 
the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Emergency Act of 2023 (“Act 25-239”). Act 25-
239 became law on October 11, 2023 and expires on January 9, 2024. 
(e) On October 3, 2023, the Council adopted a corresponding third round of temporary 
legislation, the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Emergency Act of 2023. The 
temporary measure was enacted without the Mayor’s signature on October 26, 2023 and was 
transmitted to Congress on November 6, 2023 (“temporary measure”). 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
(f) This temporary measure is not projected to become law until January 17, 2024. This 
identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of 
the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary measure.  
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing 
Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 must be adopted after a single 
reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.