8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-365 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | December 5, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
17 | | - | to continue existing requirements for providers of commercial or residential rental |
---|
18 | | - | property to abide by agreed upon rent payment plans with eligible tenants. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution |
---|
21 | | - | may be cited as the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review |
---|
22 | | - | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) During the COVID-19 pandemic, the Council created protections and |
---|
25 | | - | procedural changes to address the widespread ramifications of the public health emergency and |
---|
26 | | - | its aftermath. The District removed the initial COVID-19 public health emergency in July |
---|
27 | | - | 2021. The Coronavirus Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2021, effective June 24, 2021 |
---|
28 | | - | (D.C. Law 24-9; 68 DCR 4824) (“Temporary Act”), which contained many of the longer-term |
---|
29 | | - | protective measures, expired on February 4, 2022. |
---|
30 | | - | (b) For commercial and residential tenants, provisions in the Temporary Act provided |
---|
31 | | - | that their rental provider were required to offer a rent payment plan for eligible tenants |
---|
32 | | - | between March 11, 2020, and July 25, 2022. The payment plans had to have a minimum term |
---|
33 | | - | length of one year, unless otherwise agreed upon by the tenant and provider, during which time |
---|
34 | | - | providers could not report to credit reporting agencies as delinquent any payments made under |
---|
35 | | - | an agreed upon plan. The Temporary Act also required providers to retain tenant payment plan |
---|
36 | | - | applications for at least 3 years. |
---|
37 | | - | (c) The Council passed two rounds of emergency and temporary legislation to ensure |
---|
38 | | - | continuity in the law for tenants whose payment plans are not yet complete and to uphold the |
---|
39 | | - | requirement that providers retain payment plan application records for at least 3 years. |
---|
40 | | - | (d) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted a third round of emergency legislation, |
---|
41 | | - | the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Emergency Act of 2023 (“Act 25-239”). Act 25- |
---|
42 | | - | 239 became law on October 11, 2023 and expires on January 9, 2024. |
---|
43 | | - | (e) On October 3, 2023, the Council adopted a corresponding third round of temporary |
---|
44 | | - | legislation, the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Emergency Act of 2023. The |
---|
45 | | - | temporary measure was enacted without the Mayor’s signature on October 26, 2023 and was |
---|
46 | | - | transmitted to Congress on November 6, 2023 (“temporary measure”). |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
| 4 | + | _______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 6 | + | 3 |
---|
| 7 | + | 4 |
---|
| 8 | + | 5 |
---|
| 9 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 |
---|
| 10 | + | __________ 7 |
---|
| 11 | + | 8 |
---|
| 12 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 |
---|
| 13 | + | ____________________ 10 |
---|
| 14 | + | 11 |
---|
| 15 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 12 |
---|
| 16 | + | to continue existing requirements for providers of commercial or residential rental 13 |
---|
| 17 | + | property to abide by agreed upon rent payment plans with eligible tenants. 14 |
---|
| 18 | + | 15 |
---|
| 19 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 16 |
---|
| 20 | + | may be cited as the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review 17 |
---|
| 21 | + | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 18 |
---|
| 22 | + | Sec. 2. (a) During the COVID-19 pandemic, the Council created protections and 19 |
---|
| 23 | + | procedural changes to address the widespread ramifications of the public health emergency and 20 |
---|
| 24 | + | its aftermath. The District removed the initial COVID-19 public health emergency in July 21 |
---|
| 25 | + | 2021. The Coronavirus Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2021, effective June 24, 2021 22 |
---|
| 26 | + | (D.C. Law 24- 9; 68 DCR 4824) (“Temporary Act”), which contained many of the longer-term 23 |
---|
| 27 | + | protective measures, expired on February 4, 2022. 24 |
---|
| 28 | + | (b) For commercial and residential tenants, provisions in the Temporary Act provided 25 |
---|
| 29 | + | that their rental provider were required to offer a rent payment plan for eligible tenants 26 |
---|
| 30 | + | between March 11, 2020, and July 25, 2022. The payment plans had to have a minimum term 27 |
---|
| 31 | + | length of one year, unless otherwise agreed upon by the tenant and provider, during which time 28 |
---|
| 32 | + | providers could not report to credit reporting agencies as delinquent any payments made under 29 |
---|
55 | | - | (f) This temporary measure is not projected to become law until January 17, 2024. This |
---|
56 | | - | identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of |
---|
57 | | - | the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary measure. |
---|
58 | | - | |
---|
59 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
60 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing |
---|
61 | | - | Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 must be adopted after a single |
---|
62 | | - | reading. |
---|
63 | | - | |
---|
64 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 35 | + | an agreed upon plan. The Temporary Act also required providers to retain tenant payment plan 30 |
---|
| 36 | + | applications for at least 3 years. 31 |
---|
| 37 | + | (c) The Council passed two rounds of emergency and temporary legislation to ensure 32 |
---|
| 38 | + | continuity in the law for tenants whose payment plans are not yet complete and to uphold the 33 |
---|
| 39 | + | requirement that providers retain payment plan application records for at least 3 years. 34 |
---|
| 40 | + | (d) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted a third round of emergency legislation 35 |
---|
| 41 | + | called the “ Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Emergency Act of 2023” . The Act 36 |
---|
| 42 | + | became law on October 11, 2023 and expires on January 9, 2024. 37 |
---|
| 43 | + | (e) On October 3, 2023, the Council adopted a corresponding third round of temporary 38 |
---|
| 44 | + | legislation called the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Emergency Act of 2023”. The 39 |
---|
| 45 | + | temporary measure was enacted without the Mayor’s signature on October 26, 2023 and was 40 |
---|
| 46 | + | transmitted to Congress on November 6, 2023. 41 |
---|
| 47 | + | (f) This measure is not projected to become law until January 17, 2024. This identical 42 |
---|
| 48 | + | emergency legislation is therefore necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration 43 |
---|
| 49 | + | of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 44 |
---|
| 50 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 45 |
---|
| 51 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Tenant 46 |
---|
| 52 | + | Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 must be 47 |
---|
| 53 | + | adopted after a single reading. 48 |
---|
| 54 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 49 |
---|