District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0548 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
1+1
22
33
4+ _______________________________ 1
5+Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2
6+ 3
7+ 4
8+ 5
9+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6
10+__________ 7
11+ 8
12+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9
13+____________________ 10
14+ 11
15+ 12
16+To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 13
17+to amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary 14
18+agreements. 15
19+ 16
20+RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 17
21+may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency 18
22+Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 19
23+Sec. 2. (a) Section 215 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985 (D.C. Code § 42 -20
24+3502.21) allows housing providers to enter into an agreement with 70% or more of the 21
25+tenants in a housing accommodation to establish the rent charged, to make changes to 22
26+services and facilities, and to provide for capital improvements. These agreements are 23
27+called voluntary agreements and must be filed with the Rent Administrator. 24
28+(b) In September 2020, the former Committee on Housing and Neighborhood 25
29+Revitalization held a hearing to contemplate Bill 23 -878, the “Voluntary Agreement 26
30+Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020,” which would impose a 2- year moratorium on 27
31+voluntary agreements. According to the Committee Report, a majority of public 28
32+witnesses, then -Director of the Department of Housing and Community Development 29
33+Polly Donaldson, and Chief Tenant Advocate Johanna Shreve testified in support of the 30 2
434
535
6-1
7-
8-A RESOLUTION
9-
10-25-366
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-December 5, 2023
36+moratorium; many expressed that the legislation should go further and eliminate 31
37+voluntary agreements altogether. A few testimonies stated the importance of voluntary 32
38+agreements to small landlords, though most focused on the negative impact voluntary 33
39+agreements have had on tenants’ rights and the affordable housing stock. 34
40+(c) In December 2020, the Council unanimously passed the 2 -year moratorium. 35
41+Because the measure was subject to appropriations, the moratorium ultimately took effect 36
42+at the beginning of Fiscal Year 2022 on October 1, 2021. 37
43+(d) In July 2023, Councilmember Bonds introduced legislation that would 38
44+eliminate voluntary agreements on a permanent basis. The Council has not yet held a 39
45+hearing on this new legislation. 40
46+(e) The existing 2- year moratorium expired on October 1, 2023. 41
47+(f) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the “Voluntary Agreement 42
48+Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023” to extend the moratorium for one 43
49+year, which will give the Council time to deliberate a permanent legislative solution. The 44
50+Act became law on October 11, 2023 and expires on January 9, 2024. 45
51+(g) On October 3, 2023, the Council adopted the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium 46
52+Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. The temporary measure was enacted without the Mayor’s 47
53+signature on October 26, 2023 and was transmitted to Congress on November 6, 2023. 48
54+(h) This measure is not projected to become law until January 17, 2024. This identical 49
55+emergency legislation is therefore necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of 50
56+the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 51
57+Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 52 3
1558
1659
17-To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the
18-need to amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary
19-agreements.
20-
21-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution
22-may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency
23-Declaration Resolution of 2023”.
24-
25-Sec. 2. (a) Section 215 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17,
26-1985 (D.C. Law 6-10; D.C. Code § 42-3502.21), allows housing providers to enter into
27-an agreement with 70% or more of the tenants in a housing accommodation to establish
28-the rent charged, to make changes to services and facilities, and provide for capital
29-improvements. These agreements are called voluntary agreements and must be filed
30-with the Rent Administrator.
31-(b) In September 2020, the former Committee on Housing and Neighborhood
32-Revitalization held a hearing to contemplate Bill 23-878, the Voluntary Agreement
33-Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020, which would impose a 2-year moratorium on
34-voluntary agreements. According to the Committee Report, a majority of public
35-witnesses, the then-Director of the Department of Housing and Community
36-Development Polly Donaldson, and Chief Tenant Advocate Johanna Shreve testified in
37-support of the moratorium; many expressed that the legislation should go further and
38-eliminate voluntary agreements altogether. A few testimonies stated the importance of
39-voluntary agreements to small landlords, though most focused on the negative impact
40-voluntary agreements have had on tenants’ rights and the affordable housing stock.
41-(c) In December 2020, the Council unanimously passed the 2-year moratorium.
42-Because the measure was subject to appropriations, the moratorium ultimately took
43-effect at the beginning of Fiscal Year 2022 on October 1, 2021.
44-(d) In July 2023, Councilmember Bonds introduced legislation that would
45-eliminate voluntary agreements on a permanent basis. The Council has not yet held a
46-hearing on this introduced legislation.
47-(e) The existing 2-year moratorium expired on October 1, 2023.
48-(f) On September 19, 2023, the Council enacted the Voluntary Agreement ENROLLED ORIGINAL
49-
50-
51-
52-
53-2
54-
55-Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 (“emergency act”) to extend the
56-moratorium for one year, which will give the Council time to deliberate a permanent
57-legislative solution. The emergency act became law on October 11, 2023, and expires
58-on January 9, 2024.
59-(g) On October 3, 2023, the Council adopted the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium
60-Temporary Amendment Act of 2023 (“temporary measure”). The temporary measure was
61-enacted without the Mayor’s signature on October 26, 2023, and was transmitted to Congress on
62-November 6, 2023.
63-(h) The temporary measure is not projected to become law until January 17, 2024. This
64-identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of
65-the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary measure.
66-
67-Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2
68-constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Voluntary Agreement
69-Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a
70-single reading.
71-
72-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
60+enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 53
61+Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a 54
62+single reading. 55
63+Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 56