| 3 | + | 1 |
---|
| 4 | + | ___________________________ ______________________________ 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Charles Allen Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | _________________ 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | _________________________ 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend section 25-113 of 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | the District of Columbia Official Code to extend the expiration date of the Streatery 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | Program. 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Streatery Program Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | of 2023”. 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On June 30, 2022, the Reopen Washington DC Alcoholic Beverage Regulation 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | Amendment Act of 2022 took effect (D.C. Law 24-127), which allows Alcoholic Beverage 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | Control Board (“Board”) licensed establishments that register with the Board to offer beer, wine, 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | or spirits for sale on expanded outdoor space until December 31, 2023 (“Streatery Program”). 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | (b) As of October 17, 2023, there are currently 178 licensed establishments that have 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | registered and possess temporary Streatery Program endorsements from the Board that will 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | expire on December 31, 2023. 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | (c) On October 11, 2023, the District Department of Transportation (“DDOT”) 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | announced the extension of temporary Streatery Program permits through December 31, 2024, to 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | allow DDOT more time to develop regulations and guidelines needed to facilitate a permanent 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | Streatery Program. 33 2 |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-375 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | December 5, 2023 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend section 25- 113 of |
---|
17 | | - | the District of Columbia Official Code to extend the expiration date of the Streatery |
---|
18 | | - | Program. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
21 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “ Streatery Program Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution |
---|
22 | | - | of 2023” . |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On June 30, 2022, the Reopen Washington DC Alcoholic Beverage Regulation |
---|
25 | | - | Amendment Act of 2022 took effect (D.C. Law 24-127), which allows Alcoholic Beverage |
---|
26 | | - | Control Board (“Board”) licensed establishments that register with the Board to offer beer, wine, |
---|
27 | | - | or spirits for sale on expanded outdoor space until December 31, 2023 (“Streatery Program”) . |
---|
28 | | - | (b) As of October 17, 2023, there are currently 178 licensed establishments that have |
---|
29 | | - | registered and possess temporary Streatery Program endorsements from the Board that will |
---|
30 | | - | expire on December 31, 2023. |
---|
31 | | - | (c) On October 11, 2023, the District Department of Transportation (“DDOT”) |
---|
32 | | - | announced the extension of temporary Streatery Program permits through December 31, 2024, to |
---|
33 | | - | allow DDOT more time to develop regulations and guidelines needed to facilitate a permanent |
---|
34 | | - | Streatery Program. |
---|
35 | | - | (d) The Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Administration (“ABCA”) is currently |
---|
36 | | - | working on legislation that would amend Title 25 of the District of Columbia Official Code to |
---|
37 | | - | create a permanent Streatery Program endorsement. ABCA is also working collaboratively with |
---|
38 | | - | DDOT on a permanent Streatery Program. In the interim, emergency legislation is necessary to |
---|
39 | | - | extend the Streatery Program for an additional year while permanent legislation is considered by |
---|
40 | | - | the Council. |
---|
41 | | - | |
---|
42 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
43 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Streatery Program Extension Emergency |
---|
44 | | - | Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 37 | + | (d) The Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Administration (“ABCA”) is currently 34 |
---|
| 38 | + | working on legislation that would amend Title 25 of the District of Columbia Official Code to 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | create a permanent Streatery Program endorsement. ABCA is also working collaboratively with 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | DDOT on a permanent Streatery Program. In the interim, emergency legislation is necessary to 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | extend the Streatery Program for an additional year while permanent legislation is considered by 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | the Council. 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Streatery Program Extension Emergency 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 43 |
---|