| 4 | + | ___________________________ 1 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 6 | + | 3 |
---|
| 7 | + | 4 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 5 |
---|
| 9 | + | ________ 6 |
---|
| 10 | + | 7 |
---|
| 11 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8 |
---|
| 12 | + | ______________________ 9 |
---|
| 13 | + | 10 |
---|
| 14 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Rental Housing 11 |
---|
| 15 | + | Act of 1985 to enact a moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance of, 12 |
---|
| 16 | + | certificates of assurance associated with District rent stabilization laws . 13 |
---|
| 17 | + | 14 |
---|
| 18 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 15 |
---|
| 19 | + | may be cited as the “Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Second Extension Emergency 16 |
---|
| 20 | + | Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 17 |
---|
| 21 | + | Sec. 2. (a) Section 221 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985 (D.C. Code § 42-18 |
---|
| 22 | + | 3502.21) allows owners of housing accommodations to apply for certificates of assurance 19 |
---|
| 23 | + | from the Mayor, which would provide that in the event their properties become subject to 20 |
---|
| 24 | + | any rent stabilization, the owners would recover in the form of a District real estate tax 21 |
---|
| 25 | + | credit the difference between the annual fair market rents and the annual amount of 22 |
---|
| 26 | + | stabilized rents the owners receive from the tenants in the housing accommodations . 23 |
---|
| 27 | + | (b) Because the certificate of assurance entitlement lasts for as long as the 24 |
---|
| 28 | + | properties remain housing accommodations , the entitlement may create a potentially 25 |
---|
| 29 | + | prohibitive fiscal impact on future reform legislation . 26 |
---|
| 30 | + | (c) Implementation barriers and concerns kept the program from ever being fully 27 |
---|
| 31 | + | operational. 28 2 |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-393 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | December 19, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Rental |
---|
17 | | - | Housing Act of 1985 to enact a moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s |
---|
18 | | - | issuance of, certificates of assurance associated with District rent stabilization laws. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution |
---|
21 | | - | may be cited as the “Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Second Extension Emergency |
---|
22 | | - | Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) Section 221 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. |
---|
25 | | - | Law 6-10; D.C. Code § 42-3502.21), allows owners of housing accommodations to apply for |
---|
26 | | - | certificates of assurance from the Mayor, which would provide that in the event their properties |
---|
27 | | - | become subject to any rent stabilization, the owners would recover in the form of a District real |
---|
28 | | - | estate tax credit the difference between the annual fair market rents and the annual amount of |
---|
29 | | - | stabilized rents the owners receive from the tenants in the housing accommodations. |
---|
30 | | - | (b) Because the certificate of assurance entitlement lasts for as long as the properties |
---|
31 | | - | remain housing accommodations, the entitlement may create a potentially prohibitive fiscal |
---|
32 | | - | impact on future reform legislation. |
---|
33 | | - | (c) Implementation barriers and concerns kept the program from ever being fully |
---|
34 | | - | operational. |
---|
35 | | - | (d) On September 22, 2020, the Council passed the Certificate of Assurance Moratorium |
---|
36 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2020, effective November 2, 2020 (D.C. Act 23-454; 67 DCR |
---|
37 | | - | 13216), which placed an emergency moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance |
---|
38 | | - | of, certificates of assurance to owners of housing accommodations. |
---|
39 | | - | (e) Most recently, this moratorium was extended by the Certificate of Assurance |
---|
40 | | - | Moratorium Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, effective June 14, 2023 (D.C. Law |
---|
41 | | - | 25-18; 70 DCR 6337), which will expire on January 25, 2024. |
---|
42 | | - | (f) Emergency legislation is necessary to maintain the status quo while permanent |
---|
43 | | - | legislation is introduced and considered. |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances |
---|
46 | | - | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the |
---|
47 | | - | Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Second Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be 2 |
---|
48 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | |
---|
54 | | - | adopted after a single reading. |
---|
55 | | - | |
---|
56 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 34 | + | (d) On September 22, 2020, the Council passed the Certificate of Assurance 29 |
---|
| 35 | + | Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2020 (Bill 23-0900), which placed an 30 |
---|
| 36 | + | emergency moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance of, c ertificates of 31 |
---|
| 37 | + | assurance to owners of housing accommodations. 32 |
---|
| 38 | + | (e) Most recently, this moratorium was extended by the Certificate of Assurance 33 |
---|
| 39 | + | Moratorium Second Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, which will expire on 34 |
---|
| 40 | + | January 25 |
---|
| 41 | + | th |
---|
| 42 | + | 2024. 35 |
---|
| 43 | + | (f) The Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Second Extension Emergency 36 |
---|
| 44 | + | Amendment Act of 2023 is necessary to maintain the status quo while permanent 37 |
---|
| 45 | + | legislation is introduced and considered. 38 |
---|
| 46 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 39 |
---|
| 47 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 40 |
---|
| 48 | + | Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Second Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be 41 |
---|
| 49 | + | adopted after a single reading. 42 |
---|
| 50 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 43 |
---|