District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0648 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/21/2024

                            MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
Feb
ruary 21, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of 
the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman M endelson: 
In accordance with section 
2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and section 5 	of the Office of and Commission on Nightlife and 
Culture Establishment Act of 2018, effective December 13, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-191; D.C. 
Official 
Code § 3-664), I am pleased to nominate the following individual:  
Ms. Maggie O’Neill 
Rhode Island Avenue NW 
Washington, DC 20001 
(Ward 2 )
 
for 
reappointment as th e 	District- based visual artist member of th e Commission 	on Nightlife and 
Culture, for a term to end March 15, 2025. 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m	entioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  1 
2 	airman Phil Mendelson 
3 	at the request 
of the Mayor 
4 
5 
6 	A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
7 
8 
9 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To confirm the reappointment of Maggie O'Neill to the Commission on Nightlife and Culture. 
16 
17 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Commission on Nightlife and Culture Maggie O'Neill 
19 Confirmation Resolution of 2024". 
20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment 	of: 
21 
22 	Ms. Maggie O'Neill 
23 	Rhode Island A venue NW 
24 	Washington, 
DC 20001 
25 	(Ward 2) 
26 
27 as the District-based visual artist member 	of the Commission on Nightlife and Culture, pursuant 
28 to section 5 of the Office of and Commission on Nightlife and Culture Establishment Act 	of 
29 2018, effective December 13, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-191; D.C. Official Code§ 3-664), for a term 	to 
30 end March 15, 2025. 
31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 	of the Mayor. 
33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  Maggie O'Neill 
   
 
"I believe color is the answer. I believe art creates the most unlikely and profound connection between people all over the world. I was put on this planet 
to create art, create spaces, and create connection and conversation through my work." 
 
Professional Summary 
Creative and dynamic professional with over 20 years of experience as a cultural leader, artist, and designer in Washington, D.C. 
Demonstrated success in supporting the city's creative community through innovative design projects, community-focused initiatives, 
and public art exhibitions. Entrepreneurial spirit with a proven track record of transforming commercial spaces, including the iconic 
Willard Hotel, and contributing to the cultural landscape of the nation's capital. 
 
Notable Achievements and Recognition 
• Personally delivered a portrait to President Obama in 2012. 
• Featured on embassy walls globally, as well as in prestigious hotels like Sofitel, Four Seasons, and Rosewood. 
• Named the 2018 Official Artist of the National Cherry Blossom Festival. 
• Created immersive pop-up art activations, such as cherry blossoms made from D.C. parking tickets. 
 
Public Art Projects 
• "The Women Who Will" (Pennsylvania Avenue, 50 x 50 mural commissioned by Tishman Speyer and Lyft to celebrate 
Women's History Month). 
• "Together" (Collaborative mural inspired by the 2017 Women's March, supported by Shaw Main Streets & Artbox DC, and 
the DC Commission on the Arts and Humanities Public Art Building Communities grant program). 
 
Professional Experience 
SWATCHROOM, Washington, D.C. 
Founder and Creative Director 
• Led a creative design firm with a robust portfolio of 55+ commercial spaces in the District, including restaurants and iconic 
hotels. 
• Spearheaded the complete reimagining of the historic Willard Hotel. 
• Executed community-focused projects, such as pop-ups and murals, designed to be inclusive and spark open dialogue. 
• Positioned as a cultural leader at the intersection of arts and hospitality. 
 
Vote for Your Daughter (VFYD), Washington, D.C. 
Founder and Creative Director 
• Initiated and led the VFYD public art exhibit and campaign, aiming to defend the rights of American women and girls. 
• Currently fundraising to create 51 statues of young girls with life-sized fiberglass figures, collaborating with 51 selected artists. 
• Utilizing art as a vehicle to educate voters and raise awareness of issues affecting women and girls.    
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 	| Washington, DC 20004 
 
    
 
Maggie O’Neill 
 
Maggie O’Neill is an artist, designer, and creative entrepreneur 
based in the District of Columbia. Living and working in the 
neighborhood of Shaw, her work is inspired by local landscapes 
and cultural icons, her travels abroad, notable women, and fashion. 
In 2012, Ms. O’Neill had the honor of personally delivering a 
portrait to President Obama, and in 2014 her “DC Uncle Sam” was 
featured on the front page of The New York Times	. 
 
She is the co-founder of SWATCHROOM, a full-service design, 
art and fabrication studio. Through SWATCHROOM, she’s designe d notable commercial spaces 
and private residencies throughout the Mid-	Atlantic, including more than twenty restaurants and 
the offices for incubator 1776 in Washington, New York, and Dubai. She has also designed 
custom installation pieces for real estate developers, private commissions, and companies like 
Twitter and Microsoft. 
 
Ms. O’Neill is a fine artist, best known for her iconic pop impressionistic paintings of iconic 
Washington, D.C. landmarks and people, like her “Pop Capitol” and “Flynn’s Jefferson 
Memorial.” She’s been the featured speaker for Creative Mornings DC, a two-	time winner of the 
design category for DC Inno’s “50 on Fire,” named a “Woman of Influence” by Capitol File in 
2015, and her art was featured on the cover of DC Magazine’s December 2016 issue, among 
other accolades. 
 
In addition to her work, Ms. O’Neill is focused on giving back to her community and paying it 
forward. She is the founder of SUPERFIERCE, a national traveling art exhibit that highlights 
female artists, benefits local charities and mentors aspiring artists. Proceeds from her artwork 
have benefited organizations like Research Down Syndrome, Autism Speaks, Habitat for 
Humanity, DC Central Kitchen, and Project Soar. Additionally, she is active in her local 
community where she has served as a board member of Shaw Main Streets, a commercial 
revitalization and historic preservation non-	profit. 
 
A Ward 2 resident, Ms. O’Neill received her Bachelor of Science 	in Political Science from the 
College of the Holy Cross.  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
To: Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
From: Betsy Cavendish 
Date: October 5, 2023 
Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Bernard White II, Maggie 
O’Neill, Ris Lacoste, and Vinoda Basnayake as members of the Commission on 
Nightlife and Culture 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolutions and
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish