1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | 1 |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-443 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | March 5, 2024 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract No. |
---|
17 | | - | CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and |
---|
18 | | - | 6, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under |
---|
19 | | - | the contract and modifications. |
---|
20 | | - | |
---|
21 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
22 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC |
---|
23 | | - | Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
24 | | - | |
---|
25 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No. CW103327 with II |
---|
26 | | - | Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 and to authorize payment |
---|
27 | | - | for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract and modifications. |
---|
28 | | - | (b) On November 1, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement (“OCP”), on |
---|
29 | | - | behalf of the Department of Human Services, executed Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings |
---|
30 | | - | Carpet Cleaning, LLC for emergency janitorial services for migrant families and individuals |
---|
31 | | - | arriving from the Arizona- Mexico and Texas – Mexico borders with a base period of November |
---|
32 | | - | 1, 2022 through September 30, 2023, in the not-to-exceed amount of $2,500,000. |
---|
33 | | - | (c) Modification No. 1, increased the not-to-exceed amount of the base period of the |
---|
34 | | - | contract by $2,000,000, to a total not-to-exceed amount of $4,500,000. |
---|
35 | | - | (d) Modification No. 2 was an administrative modification. |
---|
36 | | - | (e) By Modification No. 3, OCP, extended the base period by one month to October 31, |
---|
37 | | - | 2023, at no cost to the District. |
---|
38 | | - | (f) By Modification No. 4, dated November 1, 2023, OCP, on behalf of the Department |
---|
39 | | - | of Human Services, exercised a part of option year 1 of Contract No. CW103327 for the period |
---|
40 | | - | November 1, 2023 through February 14, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount $950,000. |
---|
41 | | - | (g) Modification No. 5 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option year 1 for |
---|
42 | | - | the period February 15, 2024 through October 31, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount of |
---|
43 | | - | $3,445,916, thereby increasing the total not-to-exceed amount for option year 1 to $4,395,916. |
---|
44 | | - | (h) Modification No. 6 deleted section B.3 (Price Schedule) in its entirety and replaced it |
---|
45 | | - | with revised section B.3, as can be seen in Attachment A to the concomitant legislation (Bill 25- ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
46 | | - | |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
| 1 | + | |
---|