7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
| 4 | + | _______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 6 | + | 3 |
---|
| 7 | + | 4 |
---|
| 8 | + | 5 |
---|
| 9 | + | 6 |
---|
| 10 | + | 7 |
---|
| 11 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 12 | + | ________ 9 |
---|
| 13 | + | 10 |
---|
| 14 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 15 | + | _________________ 12 |
---|
| 16 | + | 13 |
---|
| 17 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, regarding the need to 14 |
---|
| 18 | + | amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to give housing providers until January 1, 2024, 15 |
---|
| 19 | + | to comply with a legislative change that requires a 60- day notice of a rent increase to 16 |
---|
| 20 | + | tenants. 17 |
---|
| 21 | + | 18 |
---|
| 22 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 19 |
---|
| 23 | + | may be cited as the “Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification Congressional Review 20 |
---|
| 24 | + | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 21 |
---|
| 25 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed Bill 25- 0074, the Fairness in 22 |
---|
| 26 | + | Renting Clarification Amendment Act of 2023, which took effect on November 28, 2023. 23 |
---|
| 27 | + | (c) Among other reforms, the legislation increased the notice period that housing 24 |
---|
| 28 | + | providers must provide to tenants of a prospective rent increase from 30 days to 60 days. 25 |
---|
| 29 | + | (d) Because of the increased notice requirement, housing providers who planned to 26 |
---|
| 30 | + | initiate rent increases between December 28, 2023, and January 27, 2024, including on January 27 |
---|
| 31 | + | 1, cannot comply with the 60- day notice requirement. 28 |
---|
| 32 | + | (e) Similarly, housing providers who planned to initiate rent increases beginning 29 |
---|
| 33 | + | February 1, 2024, would have had to provide notice to tenants by December 1, 2023, just 3 30 |
---|
| 34 | + | calendar days after the law took effect. 31 |
---|
| 35 | + | 2 |
---|
9 | | - | 25-434 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | March 5, 2024 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
16 | | - | to amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to give housing providers until January 1, |
---|
17 | | - | 2024, to comply with a legislative change that requires a 60-day notice of a rent |
---|
18 | | - | increase to tenants. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution |
---|
21 | | - | may be cited as the “Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification Congressional Review |
---|
22 | | - | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed Bill 25-74, the Fairness in |
---|
25 | | - | Renting Clarification Amendment Act of 2023, which took effect on November 28, 2023. |
---|
26 | | - | (b) Among other reforms, the legislation increased the notice period that housing |
---|
27 | | - | providers must provide to tenants of a prospective rent increase from 30 days to 60 days. |
---|
28 | | - | (c) Because of the increased notice requirement, housing providers who planned to |
---|
29 | | - | initiate rent increases between December 28, 2023, and January 27, 2024, including on January |
---|
30 | | - | 1, cannot comply with the 60-day notice requirement. |
---|
31 | | - | (d) Similarly, housing providers who planned to initiate rent increases beginning |
---|
32 | | - | February 1, 2024, would have had to provide notice to tenants by December 1, 2023, just 3 |
---|
33 | | - | calendar days after the law took effect. |
---|
34 | | - | (e) Therefore, the Council passed the Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification |
---|
35 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 on December 19, 2023, to give housing providers |
---|
36 | | - | sufficient time to comply with the new 60-day notice requirement, but that legislation will |
---|
37 | | - | expire on April 9, 2024. |
---|
38 | | - | (f) The accompanying Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification Temporary Amendment |
---|
39 | | - | Act of 2023 is not projected to become law until April |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | 12, 2024, making congressional review |
---|
42 | | - | emergency legislation necessary to avoid a gap in the law. |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 |
---|
45 | | - | constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Fairness in Renting Notice |
---|
46 | | - | Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a |
---|
47 | | - | single reading. |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 37 | + | (f) Therefore, the Council passed the Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification 32 |
---|
| 38 | + | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 on December 19, 2023, to give housing providers 33 |
---|
| 39 | + | sufficient time to comply with the new 60-day notice requirement, but that legislation will 34 |
---|
| 40 | + | expire on April 9, 2024. 35 |
---|
| 41 | + | (g) The accompanying Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification Temporary Amendment 36 |
---|
| 42 | + | Act of 2023 is not projected to become law until April 12 |
---|
| 43 | + | th |
---|
| 44 | + | , 2024, making congressional review 37 |
---|
| 45 | + | emergency legislation necessary to avoid a gap in the law. 38 |
---|
| 46 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 39 |
---|
| 47 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 40 |
---|
| 48 | + | Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act 41 |
---|
| 49 | + | of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 42 |
---|
| 50 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 43 |
---|