Council | 06/28/2024 | Resolution R25-0507, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007367 | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0507 | ||
Council | 06/06/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 05/30/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0717 | ||
Council | 05/29/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 05/28/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 05/23/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 05/16/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/23/2024 | Referred to Committee on Housing | ||
Council | 04/12/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0717 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/03/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |