Council | 06/03/2024 | Withdrawn | ||
Council | 05/23/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 05/10/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/01/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/23/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 04/19/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0720 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/08/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |