Council | 10/29/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0686 | ||
Council | 10/07/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 09/20/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 05/03/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0728 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/23/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |