Council | 06/28/2024 | Resolution R25-0539, Effective from Jun 25, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007382 | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0539 | ||
Council | 06/13/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 06/06/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0752 | ||
Council | 06/05/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 05/30/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 05/24/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/21/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/10/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0752 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 05/02/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |