Council | 07/19/2024 | Resolution R25-0570, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 008584 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0570 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/03/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0805 | ||
Council | 07/03/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 07/02/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 06/20/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/14/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 05/31/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/24/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0805 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/22/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/13/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |