Council | 09/27/2024 | Resolution R25-0632, Effective from Sep 17, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 011562 | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0632 | ||
Council | 09/12/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 07/12/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0825 | ||
Council | 07/10/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 06/27/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/14/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment | ||
Council | 06/10/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/31/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0825 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/22/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |