Council | 09/27/2024 | Resolution R25-0625, Effective from Sep 17, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 011555 | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0625 | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/16/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 07/11/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0840 | ||
Council | 07/11/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 07/10/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 07/05/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/27/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 06/14/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0840 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 06/04/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |