| 4 | + | _______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 2 |
---|
| 6 | + | 3 |
---|
| 7 | + | 4 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 5 |
---|
| 9 | + | ________ 6 |
---|
| 10 | + | 7 |
---|
| 11 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8 |
---|
| 12 | + | 9 |
---|
| 13 | + | ______________________ 10 |
---|
| 14 | + | 11 |
---|
| 15 | + | 12 |
---|
| 16 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Walter Reed 13 |
---|
| 17 | + | Development Omnibus Act of 2016 to provide that revenues received from the 14 |
---|
| 18 | + | Developer as Initial Consideration Payments under the Walter Reed Land and 15 |
---|
| 19 | + | Disposition Agreement shall, after October 1, 2023, be deposited into the Walter Reed 16 |
---|
| 20 | + | Reinvestment Fund and issued as a grant to the Developer to pay or reimburse certain 17 |
---|
| 21 | + | costs of job creation and economic development of or related to the Walter Reed 18 |
---|
| 22 | + | Redevelopment Site. 19 |
---|
| 23 | + | 20 |
---|
| 24 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 21 |
---|
| 25 | + | may be cited as the “Walter Reed Development Assistance Emergency Declaration Resolution 22 |
---|
| 26 | + | of 2024”. 23 |
---|
| 27 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On September 19, 2023, the Council unanimously passed the Walter Reed 24 |
---|
| 28 | + | Development Assistance Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, effective November 28, 2023 (D.C. 25 |
---|
| 29 | + | Act 25-0226; 70 DCR 013752), which is scheduled to expire on October 31, 2023. 26 |
---|
| 30 | + | (b) To avoid an imminent lapse in the law between the expiration of the temporary act and 27 |
---|
| 31 | + | the effective date of the permanent act, through the Fiscal Year 2025 Budget Support Act of 2024, 28 |
---|
| 32 | + | it is necessary to pass emergency legislation. 29 |
---|
| 33 | + | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 30 |
---|
| 34 | + | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Walter Reed Development Assistance 31 |
---|
| 35 | + | Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 32 2 |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-529 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | June 11, 2024 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Walter Reed |
---|
18 | | - | Development Omnibus Act of 2016 to provide that revenues received from the |
---|
19 | | - | Developer as Initial Consideration Payments under the Walter Reed Land and |
---|
20 | | - | Disposition Agreement shall, after October 1, 2023, be deposited into the Walter Reed |
---|
21 | | - | Reinvestment Fund and issued as a grant to the Developer to pay or reimburse certain |
---|
22 | | - | costs of job creation and economic development of or related to the Walter Reed |
---|
23 | | - | Redevelopment Site. |
---|
24 | | - | |
---|
25 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution |
---|
26 | | - | may be cited as the “Walter Reed Development Assistance Emergency Declaration Resolution |
---|
27 | | - | of 2024”. |
---|
28 | | - | |
---|
29 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) In 2016, the District acquired the former stie of the Walter Reed Army Medical |
---|
30 | | - | Center from the United States Army for a below-market price of $20 million (paid over 2 years), |
---|
31 | | - | pursuant to an Economic Development Conveyance Agreement (“EDC Agreement”). |
---|
32 | | - | (b) Simultaneously with the execution of the EDC Agreement, the District executed a Land |
---|
33 | | - | Disposition Agreement (“LDA”) with TPWR Developer LLC, a joint venture of Hines WR LLC, |
---|
34 | | - | UAD Walter Reed LLC (Urban Atlantic), and Triden Development Group, LLC, as master |
---|
35 | | - | developer (defined as the “Developer” in D.C. Official Code § 2-1227.01(6)). |
---|
36 | | - | (c) Pursuant to the LDA, the District transferred the Walter Reed site to the Developer for |
---|
37 | | - | $25 million in Initial Consideration Payments, to be paid in installments over 7 years, and other |
---|
38 | | - | financial and non-financial obligations. |
---|
39 | | - | (d) The original master development budget has experienced significant deviations driven |
---|
40 | | - | by a combination of historic cost escalations, depressed vertical component land values following |
---|
41 | | - | the Covid-19 pandemic and interest rate increases, and increased public infrastructure scope |
---|
42 | | - | requirements. |
---|
43 | | - | (e) To fully fund the revised master development budget and continue timely construction |
---|
44 | | - | of the remaining critical project infrastructure, the Developer is seeking financial assistance from |
---|
45 | | - | the District and additional private financing from other sources. |
---|
46 | | - | (f) Extensive improvements to road and water/sewer infrastructure are necessary to |
---|
47 | | - | construct Main Drive, NW, as an east-west route for pedestrians, bicyclists, and motorists, which |
---|
48 | | - | will provide convenient access to Georgia Avenue for residents of the Abrams Hall affordable 2 |
---|
49 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | |
---|
54 | | - | |
---|
55 | | - | veteran, senior, and senior assisted living apartments that have been constructed on the |
---|
56 | | - | development site, and for families traveling to the District of Columbia International School. |
---|
57 | | - | Completion of Main Drive, NW, will also mitigate the development’s traffic impacts on neighbors |
---|
58 | | - | in Brightwood and Shephard Park. |
---|
59 | | - | (g) In addition, critical north-south connections to and through the development stie remain |
---|
60 | | - | to be completed. |
---|
61 | | - | (h) Under the circumstances, the Council desires to direct the Initial Consideration |
---|
62 | | - | Payments to the Walter Reed Reinvestment Fund established under section 6 of the Walter Reed |
---|
63 | | - | Development Omnibus Act of 2016, effective May 18, 2016 (D.C. Law 21-119; D.C. Official Code |
---|
64 | | - | § 2-1227.04), and to provide financial assistance to the Developer in the form of grants in the |
---|
65 | | - | amount of the remaining 2 installments of Initial Consideration Payments. |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
68 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Walter Reed Development Assistance |
---|
69 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 38 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 33 |
---|