District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0846 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 06/06/2024

                            MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
June 6, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the D istrict of 
Columbia 
John A. Wilson 
Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Ch
airman M endelson: 
In 
accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 47-2853.06(d), I am pleased 
to nominate the following individual:  
Ms. LaVonne Woods 
Edgewood Street, NE 
Washington, DC 20017 
(Ward 5 )
 
f
or reappointment as 	an electrician lic en sed in th e District member of the Board of Industria	l Trades, 
for a term to end June 26, 2027. 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m	entioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, s hould the Council r equire a dditional i nformation. 
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
;;rtt~ 
thairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To confirm the reappointment ofLaVonne Woods to the Board 
of Industrial Trades. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
resolution may be cited as the "Board 
of Industrial Trades La Vonne Woods Confirmation 
Resolution 
of 2024". 
Sec. 
2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: 
Ms. LaVonne Woods 
Edgewood Street, 
NE 
Washington, DC 2001 7 
(Ward 5) 
as an electrician licensed in the District member 	of the Board of Industrial Trades, established by 
D.
C. Official Code§ 47-2853.06(d), for a term to end June 26, 2027. 
Sec. 
3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 
of the Mayor. 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  LaVonne Woods 
Professional 
Summary 
Education 
Employment 
Master Electrician with a knowledge of WMATA safety rules, 
regulations and applicable electrical and safety codes. Resourceful 
project leader and problem solver with effective communication skills; 
Seeking to apply expertise and extensive experience in the 
commercial electrical field to take on a challenging new role within the 
department. 
8/2017-1/2018 University of the District of Columbia CC 
Course of study: 
Certified Associate in Project Management (CAPM) 
8/1999 -6/2004 IBEW LOCAL 26 NJATC Washington, DC 
IBEW Local 26 Chapter of the National Joint Apprenticeship and 
Training Committee, completing a minimum of 800 hours of classroom 
work and 8000 hours of on-the-job training. 
7/2020-Present District of Columbia Department of 
Consumer and Regulatory Affairs (DCRA) 
Residential Property Maintenance and Housing Inspector 
(Independent Contractor) 
•Perform housing inspections to ensure that tenants are living
in safe conditions;
•Perform illegal construction inspections to ensure
construction projects are following the city's building code;
•Perform vacant building inspections to determine if an
unoccupied building needs to be classified as such for tax
purposes. 
•Perform elevator Quality Assurance/Life Safety Inspections
to confirm the proper operations of safety systems and 
controls. 
•Issue stop-work orders, when applicable
7/2015-Present WMATA 
Low Voltage AA Power Mechanic   *Performroutineconstruction,inspection,installation,
troubleshooting,andrepairoflowvoltageelectricat
equipmentandsystemsinWMATAownedfacilities.
*ProvideroadwaysafetyasRoadwayWorkerinCharge
(RWic)
+RWPLevel4Qualified
*Abilitytorequesttrackrightsandswitchingordersvia
GOTRS
*AbilitytocreateandapproveworkordersinMaximo
*Escortcontractorsandobserveworkoperationsfor
compliance.
NicholsPowerSystems-(8/2012-5/2015)
vourneymanElectrician
*Workeddirectlywithelevatormodemizationteamstobring
olderelevatorsuptocade;
»Keptweeklylogsofcompletedtasks:
+Maintainedandsubmittedaccurateweeklytimesheets,
‘*Maintainedcompanyvehicle;
+Maintainedfullfamiliaritywithcontractplans,specifications,and
schedules,
+Facilitatedweeklysafetymeetingwithapprentices.
 
MonaElectricLifeSafetyDivision(2004-2012)
JourneymanElectrician/FireAlarmTechnician’FireAiarmTesting
Technician
«InstallwiringanddevicesusingNFPA70andNFPA72
installationmethods;
«Maintainaccuratedrawings;Programedfirealamdevices,when
applicable,
+TestcompletebuildingfirealarmsystemusingNFPA72testing
methods;
+Useassignedelectronicdevicesincludingbutnetlimitedto
digitalcameras,personalcomputers,laptops,and
wirelesscommunicationsdevicesintheperformanceof
assignedwork;
*Propertytrainedhelpersintestingtechniquesandtime
management.
      Certifications
8/1998—6/2004JointApprenticeshipandTrainingCommittee
(Local26Chapter)
ApprenticeElectrician
Performedelectrical-relatedwiringandinstallationforcommercial
constructionprojects,includingnewconstruction,retrofits,and
remodelsundersupervisionofJoumeymanelectricians.
InternationalCodeCouncil(ICC)PropertyMaintenanceand
HousingInspector
D.C.MasterElectrician'sLicense
OHSA10  Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s 	Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
LaVonne Woods 
Ms. LaVonne Woods is a Master Electrician and serves the District of 
Columbia Department of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs as an 
Independent Contractor, Residential Property Maintenance and 
Housing Inspector. 
Ms. Woods leveraged her more than 20 years of electrical trade 
expertise to found Alpha Power and Alarm Company, where she serves 
as President and Chief Executive Officer. Prior to her current role, Ms. 
Woods was the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Low 
Volatge AA Power Mechanic and Nichols Power System Journeyman 
Electrician. 
In addition, Ms. Woods founded non-	profit organization the “More Better Man Foundation” 
in honor of her late father Raymond Woods. Every year, she provides charitable donations and 
donates Thanksgiving baskets to local charities servicing families in need.  
A Ward 5 resident, Ms. Woods earned a 	D.C. Master Electician license and the International Code 
Council Property Maintenance and Housing Inspector certification.  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From: Betsy Cavendish 
Date: March 29, 2024 
Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Shawn Ellis, Tanya Lewis, 
and LaVonne Woods as members of the Board of Industrial Trades  
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolutions and
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish