District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0868 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 06/20/2024

                            MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
Ju
ne 20, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of 
the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman M endelson: 
In accordance with section 
2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant 	to section 4 of the Office on Ex-Offender Affairs 
and Commission on Re-Entry and Ex-Offender Affairs Establishment Act of 2006, effective March 8, 
2007 
(D.C. Law 16-243; D.C. Official Code § 24-1303), I am 	pleased to nominate the following 
individual:  
Mr. James T. Dunn 
Monroe Street, NE 
Washington, DC 20017 
(Ward 5) 
for 
appointment as a public voting member of the Commission on 	Re-Entry and Returning Citizen 
Af
fairs, filling a vacant 	seat, for a term to end August 4, 2027. 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m	entioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
~:?;~ 
cffurrnanihilMendelson 
at the request of the Mayor 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To confirm the appointment of James T. Dunn to the Commission on Re-Entry and Returning 
16 Citizen Affairs. 
17 
18 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT 	OF COLUMBIA, that this 
19 resolution may be cited as the "Commission on Re-Entry and Returning Citizen Affairs James 	T. 
20 Dunn Confirmation Resolution 	of 2024". 
21 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment 	of: 
22 
23 	Mr. James T. Dunn 
24 	Monroe Street, NE 
25 	Washington, DC 2001 7 
26 	(Ward 5) 
27 
28 as a public voting member of the Commission on Re-Entry and Returning Citizen Affairs, 
29 established by section 4 
of the Office on Ex-Offender Affairs and Commission on Re-Entry and 
30 Ex-Offender Establishment Act 	of 2006, effective March 8, 2007 (D.C. Law 16-243; D.C. 
31 Official Code § 24-1303 ), filling a vacant seat, for a term to end August 	4, 2027. 
32 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
33 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor. 
34 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.   JamesT.Dunn
NWWashington,DC20002
SUMMAR'
NativeWashingtonianwithoveradecadeofexperienceincommunity
development,communityoutreach&financialliteracyexpertise.Aninfluencer,
creatingandmanagingcurriculumsincomplexanddynamicenvironmentsto
meetorganizationalgoalsandachievesuccess.
 
PROFESSIONALEXPERIENCE:
ExpertStockMarketInstructor
LeadfinancialliteracyclassesonhowtoinvestinMutualFunds,IPO’s,Stocks,
etc.
eInstructorofincomeinvestingindividendpayingstocks
LeadOutreachSpecialist,NationalAssociationfortheAdvancementofReturning
Citizens
©Workwithindividualswhohavebeenidentifiedtobeatthehighestriskof
involvementingunviolence,formulateactionplanstoresolveconflicts,develop
relationshipswithkeyindividualsandmeetwiththemdaily,coachindividualson
howtohandlestressfuleventswithoutresortingtoviolentbehavior,train
individualsandgroupsonspecificstrategiestomotivatebehaviorchanges,
documentdailylogofalleffortsasrequiredintheagency’sdatabase,attenddaily
briefingsanddebriefings,attendteammeetingsweekly,andsubmitreportsto
communityleaders,governmentofficials,andtheOfficeoftheAttorneyGeneral
OutreachWorker-FatherFactorInc.MurderFreeDC2019-2020
©Workswithat-riskyouthwhoengageinorarevictimsofgunviolence
Providementorshipandserveasanadvisorwithagoalofreducinghighrisk
behaviorstolowriskwithin90daysthroughindividualizedtreatment   *Workedwithclientstodevelopoptionsstrategiesbasedontheirrisk
toleranceandgoals,resultingina75%increaseinclientsatisfaction
*DevelopedoptiontradingmodelsusingExcelspreadsheetsforanalysisof
potentialtradesbeforeexecutingthem
*Conductedresearchoncompanies’fundamentalsandearningsreportsto
determinethebeststrategyforeachtrade
*Tradedbothlong-term(buy-and-hold)positionsaswellasshort-termswing
trades(~1weekholdtime)
*Managedmarginaccountstotaling$500K;usedstoplossesandlimitorders
tomitigateriskexposure
*Analyzedclientportfoliosandrecommendedchangestoassetallocation.
*Conductedresearchonindividualsecuritiesandmaderecommendationsto
clients.
*Monitoredmarketconditionsandadvisedclientsonbuyingandselling
strategies.
  jalCerition:
Certificate-SmartInvesting,AdultContinuingEducationCoordinator
Certificate-AlternativestoViolenceWorkshop,WorkshopsforTraining
Nonviolence
Certificate-OutstandingVolunteerInstruction,AdultContinuingEducation
Coordinator
Certificate-BuildingBlockstoaHealthyCommunity,LifeConnectionsProgram
Certificate-ConflictManagement,LifeConnectionsProgram
Certificate-ImpactofCrimesonVictims,LifeConnectionsProgram
 
FormalEducation:
CentralTexasCollege2009-2010
ComputerTechnology;Completedone-yearcourse
RelatedExperience:NCCER2007-CORE;Certified   
Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
James Dunn 
 
Mr. James Dunn is a business owner, experienced O	ptions and S tock 
Market Trader, financial s trategist, and change a gent who partners with 
CEOs, executives, and entrepreneurs to grow their personal finances 
and professional brands, human-	to-human. After spending nearly a 
decade learning how to navigate the stock markets, he began trading for 
other individuals and eventually found a passion in education, utilizing 
financial literacy to engage audiences of all ages, backgrounds and 
socioeconomic status. Mr. Dunn knows what truly drives one’s savings 
potential, wealth trajectory and generational wealth—and it’s not 
landing the highest paying jobs or mastering the stock flavor of the 
week. It’s how well you connect the dots between your earnings and 
savings, focusing your spending on needs and not wants in the short 
term to achieve financial freedom in the long term. He also understands the importance of 
connecting with the heartbeat of people you’re trying to help and communicating your 
understanding back to them.  
Mr. Dunn recently launched “From the Streets to Wallstreet,” a program to introduce youth in 
urban communities to the stock market and financial literacy, and to 	expose them to the inner 
workings of America’s financial center in New York City. With a partnership with some of the 
world’s financial elite, “From the Streets to Wallstreet” is poised to become one of the leading 
financial literacy programs for youth and 	young adults in urban communities. In addition to his 
extensive knowledge of the stock market, he is a serial entrepreneur; currently owning a logistics 
company that moves freight throughout the US, operates a mobile barbering company, 	serves as 
Vice President of FLINT, LLC, providing education and human services to residents of the DC 
metropolitan area, and is a trained public speaker. 
Mr. Dunn is a Ward 5 resident.  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
 
To:   Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   June 7, 2024 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating James Berry, Jr., Kennetta 
Calloway, Larry Moon, James Dunn, Ricardo W. Sheppard, Maurice Tyree, and 
Myra Woods as members of the Commission on Re-Entry and Returning Citizen 
Affairs 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish