ENROLLED ORIGINAL A RESOLUTION 25-531 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA June 25, 2024 To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to amend the Condominium Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ associations to conduct virtual meetings and to clarify voting and quorum requirements for such meetings; and to amend section 29-910 of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow cooperatives to conduct remote meetings. RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. Sec. 2. (a) On April 15, 2024, the Mayor signed into effect the Association Meeting Flexibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, which maintains flexibility for condominium and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually without the need to amend their bylaws. This emergency legislation is due to expire on July 14, 2024. (b) On May 29, 2024, the Mayor signed an identical temporary measure, the Association Meeting Flexibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024. Due to congressional review, the projected law date for this temporary legislation is August 1, 2024. (c) Emergency legislation is necessary to avoid a lapse in the law. Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute an emergency making it necessary that the Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.