1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | 25-531 |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | June 25, 2024 |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
16 | | - | to amend the Condominium Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ |
---|
17 | | - | associations to conduct virtual meetings and to clarify voting and quorum requirements |
---|
18 | | - | for such meetings; and to amend section 29-910 of the District of Columbia Official Code |
---|
19 | | - | to allow cooperatives to conduct remote meetings. |
---|
20 | | - | |
---|
21 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
22 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review |
---|
23 | | - | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
24 | | - | |
---|
25 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On April 15, 2024, the Mayor signed into effect the Association Meeting |
---|
26 | | - | Flexibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, which maintains flexibility for condominium |
---|
27 | | - | and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually without the need to amend their |
---|
28 | | - | bylaws. This emergency legislation is due to expire on July 14, 2024. |
---|
29 | | - | (b) On May 29, 2024, the Mayor signed an identical temporary measure, the Association |
---|
30 | | - | Meeting Flexibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024. Due to congressional review, the |
---|
31 | | - | projected law date for this temporary legislation is August 1, 2024. |
---|
32 | | - | (c) Emergency legislation is necessary to avoid a lapse in the law. |
---|
33 | | - | |
---|
34 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
35 | | - | an emergency making it necessary that the Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional |
---|
36 | | - | Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 1 | + | 1 |
---|
| 2 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 3 | + | 3 |
---|
| 4 | + | 4 |
---|
| 5 | + | 5 |
---|
| 6 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 |
---|
| 7 | + | __________ 7 |
---|
| 8 | + | 8 |
---|
| 9 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 |
---|
| 10 | + | ____________________ 10 |
---|
| 11 | + | 11 |
---|
| 12 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency , due to congressional review, with respect to the need 12 |
---|
| 13 | + | to amend the Condominium Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ 13 |
---|
| 14 | + | associations to conduct virtual meetings and to clarify voting and quorum requirements 14 |
---|
| 15 | + | for such meetings; and to amend section 29- 910 of the District of Columbia Official Code 15 |
---|
| 16 | + | to allow cooperatives to conduct remote meetings. 16 |
---|
| 17 | + | 17 |
---|
| 18 | + | RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 18 |
---|
| 19 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review 19 |
---|
| 20 | + | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 20 |
---|
| 21 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On April 15, 2024, the Mayor signed into effect the Association Meeting 21 |
---|
| 22 | + | Flexibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, which maintains flexibility for condominium 22 |
---|
| 23 | + | and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually without the need to amend their 23 |
---|
| 24 | + | bylaws. This emergency legislation is due to expire on July 14, 2024. 24 |
---|
| 25 | + | (b) On May 29, 2024, the Mayor signed an identical temporary measure, the Association 25 |
---|
| 26 | + | Meeting Flexibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024. Due to congressional review, the 26 |
---|
| 27 | + | projected law date for this temporary legislation is August 1, 2024. 27 |
---|
| 28 | + | (c) Emergency legislation is necessary to avoid a lapse in the law. 28 |
---|
| 29 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 29 |
---|
| 30 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute an emergency making it necessary that the Association 30 |
---|
| 31 | + | Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after 31 |
---|
| 32 | + | a single reading. 32 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 33 |
---|