District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0889 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/27/2024

                    �������	���� ���
������
��D�=�)�J	���
�J �� 	���J
��>�=�>�A�$�&�:�)�J	� �5�7�:�J	��)�=�(�)�:�B�>�=�J
��5�$�7�A�;�$�=�J
�
�> �D �=�'	�7�:�J �>	�* �J�C �5 �)�J �	�7�B �C �A�7�'�C�J	�>�*�J	�	�>�:�D�;�&�7�$�J
��>�5�=�J	���J	�#�7�:�B�>�=�J	��D�7�:�(�7�=�4�J
���� �J	� �)�=�=�B�H�:�E�$�=�7�$�J	�
�E �)�=	�D�)��J	��#��J	�!�D�7�C�)�J	�� �	�J
�#�$�B�5�7�=�4�C�>�=��J	�
��J	�� � � ��J
��)
�$�A�J	��5	�$ �7�A�;�$�=�J	��)�=�(�)�:�B�>�=��J
�
�=�'�:	�> �B�)	�(�J	�2�A�J	�'�>�=�B�7�(�)�A�$�C�7�>�=�J	�$�=�(�J	�)�=�$�'�C�;�)�=�C�J	�&�H�J	�C�5�)	�J ��>�D�=	�'�7�:�J	�>	�*�J	�C	�5�)�J	��7�B�C�A�7�'�C�J	�>	�*�J	�	�>�:�D�;�&�7�$�J	�7�B�J	�$�=�J
�)
�;�)�A�4�)�=�'�H�J	�&�7	�:�:��J	�C�5�)�J	�	��>�(�7�,�8�'�$�C�7�>�=�J��>�B��J	���J	��	�J �	��J �$	�=�(�J	� �J �C�>�J	��>�=�C�A�$�'�C�J	��>�	�J ��#�� ���� �J	�F	�7�C�5�J	��)�=�C	�>�A�J
�����J	����J	��?�?�A�>�E�$�:�J	�$�=�(�J	� �$�H�<�)�=�C�J ��D�C�5�>�A
�7�I�$�C�7�>�=�J	��;�)�A�4�)�=�'�H�J	��'�C�J	�>	�*�J �� �����J	�$�=�(�J	�C�5�)�J	�$�'	�'�>�;�?�$�=�H�7�=�4�J
�)
�;	�)�A�4�)�=�'�H�J	�(�)�'�:�$�A�$�C�7�>�=�J	�A�)�B�>�:�D�C�7�>�=�J	�C	�>�J	�$�?�?�A�>�E�)�J	�;	�D�:�C�7�H�)�$�A�J	�'�>�=�C�A�$�'�C�J	�	�>�=�C	�A�$�'�C�J	��>	��J ��#�� ���� �J	�F�7�C�5�J
��)�=�C�>�A�J�����J�
����J�7�=�J�C�5�)�J�$�;�>	�D�=�C�J�>�*�J��>�C��C�>��)�G�'	�)�)�(�J�J���� �	���� � �
�"�5�)�J	�:
�)�4�7�B�:�$�C�7�>�=�J	�F	�7�:�:�J	�$�?	�?�A�>�E�)�J	��>�(�7�0�'�$�C�7�>�=�J	�	�> �B��J	���J	��	�J �	��J �$	�=�(�J	��J	�C�>�J	��>�=�C�A�$�'�C�J	�	�> ��J ��#�� ���� �J	�F	�7�C�5�J
��)
�=�C�>�A	�J �����J	�	���J	�2	�A �J �?	�>�B�C��$�'�D�C�)�J �A�)�5�$�&�7�:�7�C�$�C	�7�>�=�J �;�)�(�7�'�$�:�J �B�)�A�E�7�'�)�B�J	�$�=�(	�J �=	�)�D�A�>�&�)�5�$�E�7�>�A�$�:�J	�?	�A�>�4�A�$�;�B��J	�C�>�J
�3
�: �:�H�J�)	�G �)�A�'�7	�B �)�J�>�?�C�7�>�=�J�H�)�$�A�J�>�=	�)�J�>�*	�J�C�5�)�J�'�>�=�C�A�$�'�C��J��=�J�$�(�(	�7�C�7�>�=��J�C�5�)�J�:�)�4�7�B�:�$	�C�7�>�=�J�F�7�:�:�J�$�?�?�A�>�E	�)�J�?�$�H�;�)�=�C�J�2�A�J
�C�5�)�J�4�>�>�(�B�J
�$ �=�(�J�B�)�A�E�7�'	�)�B�J	�A �)�'�)�7�E�)�(�J�$�=�(�J�C�>�J�&�)�J	�A�)	�'�)�7�E�)�(�J	�D�=�(�)�A�J�C�5�)�J�;�>�(�7�0�'	�$�C�7	�> �=�B	��J
��H�J	�$
�(�;�7	�=�7	�B�C�A	�$ �C �7�>�=�J	�7�B�J	�$�E	�$ �7�: �$�&�:�)	�J �C�>�J	�(�7	�B �'�D�B�B�J	�$�=�H�J	�@	�D �)�B�C	�7�>�=�B�J	�H�>�D�J	�;�$�H�J	�6�$�E�)�J	�A�)	�4 �$�A�(�7�=�4�J	�C�5�)	�J �?	�A�>�?�>�B	�)�(�J
�'�>�=
�C �A �$�'�C�J	�;�>�(�7�0�'�$�C�7�>�=�B��J	��=�J	�>�A�(�)�A�J	�C�>�J	�,�%�'�7	�:�7 �C�$�C�)�J	�$�J	�A�)	�B�?�>�=	�B�)�J	�C�>�J	�$�=�H�J	�@�D�)�B	�C�7�>�=�B�J	�H	�> �D�J	�;�$	�H �J �5�$�E�)��J	�?	�:�)�$�B	�)�J
�5�$�E�)�J	�H
�> �D�A�J	�B	�C �$ �.	�J �'�>�=�C�$�'�C�J	��$�A�'�J	�!�'�>�C�C��J	��5�7�)�*�J	��?	�)�A�$�C�7�=�4�J	��+�1	�'�)�A	��J	�	�/�'�)�J	�>�*�J	�	�>�=�C�A�$�'�C�7�=�4�J	�$�=�(�J
� 
�A �>�'�D�A�)�;�)�=�C��J�$�C�J�	�� 	��	�J ���������
��J �D
�A�4�)	�J�C �5 �)�J ��>�D�=	�'�7�:	�J �C �> �J�C �$ �9 �)�J �?	�A �>�;�?�C�J	�$�=�(�J	�-�E�>�A�$�&�:�)�J	�$�'�C�7�>�=�J	�>�=�J	�C�5�)	�J�)�=	�'�:�>�B�)�(�J	�:�)�4�7�B�:	�$�C�7�>�=��J 1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
~ 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
17 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract No. 
18 CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC, and Modification Nos. 	2, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. 
19 CW101660, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be 
20 received under the contract and modifications. 
21 
22 RESOLVED, 	BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
23 resolution may be cited 	as the "Modification Nos. 2, 	3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CWl O 1660 with 
24 Mentor ABI, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution 
of 
25 2024". 
26 Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No. CW101660 with 
27 Mentor ABI, LLC, and Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 thereto, and to authorize payment for the 
28 goods and services received and 
to be received under the contract and modifications. 
29 (b) On November 
10, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement ("OCP"), on 
30 behalf 
of the Department of Behavioral Health, executed Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor 
31 ABI, LLC, for post-acute rehabilitation medical services and neurobehavioral programs, in the 
32 not-to-exceed amount 
of $991,500. 
33 (c) On November 9, 2023, by Modification No. 2, OCP partially exercised option year 
34 one 
of the contract in the not-to-exceed amount 	of $497,100. 
1   	2 
(d) On November 16, 2023, by Modification No. 3, OCP increased the not	-to-exceed 35 
amount of the partial exercise of option year one by $54,000, from $497,100 to $551,100.  36 
(e) On April 5, 2024, by Modification No. 4, OCP increased the not-to-exceed amount of 37 
the partial exercise of option year one by $248,900, from $551,100 to $800,000. 38 
(f)  Proposed M odification No. 5 would fully exercise option year one in the not	-to-39 
exceed amount to $1,048,200. 40 
(g)  Under section 451(b)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 41 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.51(b)(1)), Council approval is 42 
required since the m odifications will increase the value of the contract to more than $1 million 43 
during a 12- month period.   44 
  (h)  Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. Without this 45 
approval, Mentor ABI, LLC cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 46 
million for the period November 10, 2023 through November 9, 2024. 47 
Sec. 3.  The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 48 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the  49 
Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC Approval 50 
and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 51 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 52