District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0889 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6- 1
7-A RESOLUTION
8-
9-25-577
10-
1+  
2+ 
3+D=)J 
4+J J
5+>=>A$&:)J 57:J )=():B>=J
6+5$7A;$=J
7+
8+> D =' 7:J > * JC 5 )J  7B C A7'CJ >*J  >:D;&7$J
9+>5=J J #7:B>=J D7:(7=4J
10+  J )==BH:E$=7$J 
11+E )= D)J #J !D7C)J  J
12+#$B57=4C>=J 
13+J J
14+)
15+$AJ 5 $ 7A;$=J )=():B>=J
16+
17+=': > B) (J 2AJ '>=B7()A$C7>=J $=(J )=$'C;)=CJ &HJ C5) J >D= '7:J > *J C 5)J 7BCA7'CJ > *J  >:D;&7$J 7BJ $=J
18+)
19+;)A4)='HJ &7 ::J C5)J  >(7,8'$C7>=J>BJ J  J J $ =(J  J C>J >=CA$'CJ > J #  J F 7C5J )=C >AJ
20+J J ??A>E$:J $=(J $H<)=CJ DC5>A
21+7I$C7>=J ;)A4)='HJ 'CJ > *J J $=(J C5)J $' '>;?$=H7=4J
22+)
23+; )A4)='HJ ()':$A$C7>=J A)B>:DC7>=J C >J $??A>E)J ; D:C7H)$AJ '>=CA$'CJ  >=C A$'CJ > J #  J F7C5J
24+)=C>AJJ
25+J7=JC5)J$;> D=CJ>*J>CC>)G' ))(JJ  
26+"5)J :
27+)47B:$C7>=J F 7::J $? ?A>E)J >(70'$C7>=J  > BJ J  J J $ =(J J C>J >=CA$'CJ  > J #  J F 7C5J
28+)
29+=C>A J J  J 2 A J ? >BC$'DC)J A)5$&7:7C$C 7>=J ;)(7'$:J B)AE7')BJ $=( J = )DA>&)5$E7>A$:J ? A>4A$;BJ C>J
30+3
31+: :HJ) G )A'7 B )J>?C7>=JH)$AJ>= )J>* JC5)J'>=CA$'CJ=J$(( 7C7>=JC5)J:)47B:$ C7>=JF7::J$??A>E )J?$H;)=CJ2AJ
32+C5)J4>>(BJ
33+$ =(JB)AE7' )BJ A )')7E)(J$=(JC>J&)J A) ')7E)(J D=()AJC5)J;>(70' $C7 > =B J
34+HJ $
35+(;7 =7 BCA $ C 7>=J 7BJ $E $ 7: $&:) J C>J (7 B 'DBBJ $=HJ @ D )BC 7>=BJ H>DJ ;$HJ 6$E)J A) 4 $A(7=4J C5) J ? A>?>B )(J
36+'>=
37+C A $'CJ ;>(70'$C7>=BJ =J >A()AJ C>J ,%'7 :7 C$C)J $J A) B?>= B)J C>J $=HJ @D)B C7>=BJ H > DJ ;$ H J 5$E)J ? :)$B )J
38+5$E)J H
39+> DAJ B C $ . J '>=C$'CJ $A'J !'>CCJ 57)*J ? )A$C7=4J +1 ')A J  /')J >*J  >=CA$'C7=4J $=(J
40+
41+A >'DA);)=CJ$CJ  J  
42+J D
43+A4) JC 5 )J >D= '7: J C > JC $ 9 )J ? A >;?CJ $=(J -E>A$&:)J $'C7>=J >=J C5) J)= ':>B)(J :)47B: $C7>=J 1
44+2
45+3
46+4
47+5
48+6
49+7
50+8
51+9
52+10
53+11
54+12
55+13
56+14
57+15
58+16
59+~
60+Chairman Phil Mendelson
61+at the request
62+of the Mayor
63+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
1164 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-July 9, 2024
14-
15-
16-To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos.
17-2, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC, and to authorize
18-payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract.
19-
20-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
21-resolution may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW101660 with
22-Mentor ABI, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of
23-2024”.
24-
25-Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to
26-Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC and to authorize payment for the goods and
27-services received and to be received under the contract.
28-(b) On November 10, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement (“OCP”), on
29-behalf of the Department of Behavioral Health, executed Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor
30-ABI, LLC, for post-acute rehabilitation medical services and neurobehavioral programs, in the
31-not-to-exceed amount of $991,500.
32-(c) On November 9, 2023, by Modification No. 2, OCP partially exercised option year
33-one of the contract in the not-to-exceed amount of $497,100.
34-(d) On November 16, 2023, by Modification No. 3, OCP increased the not-to-exceed
35-amount to $551,100.
36-(e) On April 5, 2024, by Modification No. 4, OCP increased the not-to-exceed amount to
37-$800,000.
38-(f) Proposed Modification No. 5 would fully exercise option year one in the not-to-
39-exceed amount to $1,048,200.
40-(g) Council approval is required because the modifications will increase the value of the
41-contract to more than $1 million during a 12-month period.
42- (h) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. Without this
43-approval, Mentor ABI, LLC cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1
44-million for the period November 10, 2023, through November 9, 2024.
45- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
46-
47-
48-
49-
50- 2
51-Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute
52-emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to
53-Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization
54-Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading.
55-
56-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
65+17 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract No.
66+18 CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC, and Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No.
67+19 CW101660, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be
68+20 received under the contract and modifications.
69+21
70+22 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
71+23 resolution may be cited as the "Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CWl O 1660 with
72+24 Mentor ABI, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution
73+of
74+25 2024".
75+26 Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No. CW101660 with
76+27 Mentor ABI, LLC, and Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 thereto, and to authorize payment for the
77+28 goods and services received and
78+to be received under the contract and modifications.
79+29 (b) On November
80+10, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement ("OCP"), on
81+30 behalf
82+of the Department of Behavioral Health, executed Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor
83+31 ABI, LLC, for post-acute rehabilitation medical services and neurobehavioral programs, in the
84+32 not-to-exceed amount
85+of $991,500.
86+33 (c) On November 9, 2023, by Modification No. 2, OCP partially exercised option year
87+34 one
88+of the contract in the not-to-exceed amount of $497,100.
89+1 2
90+(d) On November 16, 2023, by Modification No. 3, OCP increased the not -to-exceed 35
91+amount of the partial exercise of option year one by $54,000, from $497,100 to $551,100. 36
92+(e) On April 5, 2024, by Modification No. 4, OCP increased the not-to-exceed amount of 37
93+the partial exercise of option year one by $248,900, from $551,100 to $800,000. 38
94+(f) Proposed M odification No. 5 would fully exercise option year one in the not -to-39
95+exceed amount to $1,048,200. 40
96+(g) Under section 451(b)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 41
97+December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.51(b)(1)), Council approval is 42
98+required since the m odifications will increase the value of the contract to more than $1 million 43
99+during a 12- month period. 44
100+ (h) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. Without this 45
101+approval, Mentor ABI, LLC cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 46
102+million for the period November 10, 2023 through November 9, 2024. 47
103+Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 48
104+enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 49
105+Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC Approval 50
106+and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 51
107+Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 52