District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0889 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/09/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-577  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 9, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos. 
2, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC, and to authorize 
payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW101660 with 
Mentor ABI, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 
2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to 
Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC and to authorize payment for the goods and 
services received and to be received under the contract. 
(b) On November 10, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement (“OCP”), on 
behalf of the Department of Behavioral Health, executed Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor 
ABI, LLC, for post-acute rehabilitation medical services and neurobehavioral programs, in the 
not-to-exceed amount of $991,500. 
(c) On November 9, 2023, by Modification No. 2, OCP partially exercised option year 
one of the contract in the not-to-exceed amount of $497,100. 
(d) On November 16, 2023, by Modification No. 3, OCP increased the not-to-exceed 
amount to $551,100.  
(e) On April 5, 2024, by Modification No. 4, OCP increased the not-to-exceed amount to 
$800,000. 
(f) Proposed Modification No. 5 would fully exercise option year one in the not-to-
exceed amount to $1,048,200. 
(g) Council approval is required because the modifications will increase the value of the 
contract to more than $1 million during a 12-month period.   
  (h) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. Without this 
approval, Mentor ABI, LLC cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 
million for the period November 10, 2023, through November 9, 2024. 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the  Modification Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 to 
Contract No. CW101660 with Mentor ABI, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization 
Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.