Council | 09/25/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0902 | ||
Council | 09/24/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 09/24/2024 | Roundtable Hearing | ||
Council | 09/23/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 09/12/2024 | Withdrawn | ||
Council | 08/16/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 08/12/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/12/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0902 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 06/28/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |