District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0923 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/09/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-592  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 9, 2024 
 
 
To approve, on an emergency basis, the proposed final rules to establish requirements and 
procedures for the District Flexible Rent Subsidy Pilot Program. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Flexible Rent Subsidy Pilot Program Rules Emergency Approval 
Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 31(a) of the Homeless Services Reform Act of 2005, effective 
October 21, 2005 (D.C. Law 16-35; D.C. Official Code § 4-756.02(a)), the Council approves the 
proposed final rules of the Director of the Department of Human Services to amend Chapter 79 
of Title 29 of the District of Columbia Municipal Regulations regarding the implementation of 
the Flexible Rent Subsidy Pilot Program, which was transmitted to the Council by the Mayor on 
April 23, 2024. 
 
Sec. 3. Transmittal. 
The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the Mayor, the 
Director of the Department of Human Services, and the Administrator of the Office of 
Documents and Administrative Issuances. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director, as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 
This resolution shall take effect immediately.