District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0928 Introduced / Bill

Filed 07/08/2024

                    1 
 
    1 
 	______________________________ 2 
                                                 Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION  8 
 9 
_________ 10 
 11 
 12 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 
 14 
__________________ 15 
 16 
 17 
To declare the existence of an emergency basis, due to congressional review, with respect to the 18 
need to amend the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to 19 
set a new expiration date for qualifying patient and caregiver registration identification 20 
cards from 2 years to 6 years and to require the surrender of a registration card and 21 
notification of any registered caregiver when a person no longer requires medical 22 
cannabis; and to amend Title 47 of the District of Columbia Official Code to establish the 23 
4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week for 2024. 24 
 25 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 26 
resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical 27 
Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 28 
2024”. 29 
 Sec. 2. (a) There existed an immediate need to set a new expiration date for qualifying 30 
patient and caregiver registration identification cards from 2 years to 6 years, require the 31 
surrender of a registration card and notification of any registered caregiver when a person no 32 
longer requires medical cannabis, and to authorize the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis 33 
Administration to summarily close an unlicensed retailer; and to amend Title 47 of the District of 34 
Columbia Official Code to establish the 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week for 35 
2024. 36  2 
 
 (b) In April 2024, the Council enacted the Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 37 
4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, effective 38 
April 8, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-437; 71 DCR 4118), (“emergency legislation”) and the Medical 39 
Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week 40 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, passed on 2nd reading on May 7, 2024 (Enrolled version 41 
Bill 25-761), (“temporary legislation”) to address the above-referenced needs.  42 
 (c) The emergency legislation expires on July 7, 2024.  The temporary legislation must 43 
still complete the 30-day review period required by section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia 44 
Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-45 
206.02(c)(1)), and will not become law until after the emergency legislation has expired. 46 
 (d) It is necessary that the provisions of the emergency legislation continue in effect, 47 
without interruption, until the temporary legislation is in effect.  48 
 Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 49 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension 50 
and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Congressional Review Emergency 51 
Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 52 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 53