| 4 | + | ______________________________ 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | _________ 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | __________________ 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency basis, due to congressional review, with respect to the 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | need to amend the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | set a new expiration date for qualifying patient and caregiver registration identification 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | cards from 2 years to 6 years and to require the surrender of a registration card and 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | notification of any registered caregiver when a person no longer requires medical 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | cannabis; and to amend Title 47 of the District of Columbia Official Code to establish the 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week for 2024. 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | 2024”. 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | Sec. 2. (a) There existed an immediate need to set a new expiration date for qualifying 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | patient and caregiver registration identification cards from 2 years to 6 years, require the 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | surrender of a registration card and notification of any registered caregiver when a person no 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | longer requires medical cannabis, and to authorize the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis 33 |
---|
| 36 | + | Administration to summarily close an unlicensed retailer; and to amend Title 47 of the District of 34 |
---|
| 37 | + | Columbia Official Code to establish the 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week for 35 |
---|
| 38 | + | 2024. 36 2 |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-550 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | July 9, 2024 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency basis, due to congressional review, with respect to the |
---|
18 | | - | need to amend the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to |
---|
19 | | - | set a new expiration date for qualifying patient and caregiver registration identification |
---|
20 | | - | cards from 2 years to 6 years and to require the surrender of a registration card and |
---|
21 | | - | notification of any registered caregiver when a person no longer requires medical |
---|
22 | | - | cannabis; and to amend Title 47 of the District of Columbia Official Code to establish the |
---|
23 | | - | 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week for 2024. |
---|
24 | | - | |
---|
25 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
26 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical |
---|
27 | | - | Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of |
---|
28 | | - | 2024”. |
---|
29 | | - | |
---|
30 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) There existed an immediate need to set a new expiration date for qualifying |
---|
31 | | - | patient and caregiver registration identification cards from 2 years to 6 years, require the |
---|
32 | | - | surrender of a registration card and notification of any registered caregiver when a person no |
---|
33 | | - | longer requires medical cannabis, and to authorize the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis |
---|
34 | | - | Administration to summarily close an unlicensed retailer; and to amend Title 47 of the District of |
---|
35 | | - | Columbia Official Code to establish the 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week for |
---|
36 | | - | 2024. |
---|
37 | | - | (b) In April 2024, the Council enacted the Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and |
---|
38 | | - | 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, effective |
---|
39 | | - | April 8, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-437; 71 DCR 4118), (“emergency legislation”) and the Medical |
---|
40 | | - | Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week |
---|
41 | | - | Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, passed on 2nd reading on May 7, 2024 (Enrolled version |
---|
42 | | - | Bill 25-761), (“temporary legislation”) to address the above-referenced needs. |
---|
43 | | - | (c) The emergency legislation expires on July 7, 2024. The temporary legislation must |
---|
44 | | - | still complete the 30-day review period required by section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia |
---|
45 | | - | Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1- |
---|
46 | | - | 206.02(c)(1)), and will not become law until after the emergency legislation has expired. ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | 2 |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | (d) It is necessary that the provisions of the emergency legislation continue in effect, |
---|
54 | | - | without interruption, until the temporary legislation is in effect. |
---|
55 | | - | |
---|
56 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
57 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension |
---|
58 | | - | and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Congressional Review Emergency |
---|
59 | | - | Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
60 | | - | |
---|
61 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 40 | + | (b) In April 2024, the Council enacted the Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, effective 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | April 8, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-437; 71 DCR 4118), (“emergency legislation”) and the Medical 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, passed on 2nd reading on May 7, 2024 (Enrolled version 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | Bill 25-761), (“temporary legislation”) to address the above-referenced needs. 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | (c) The emergency legislation expires on July 7, 2024. The temporary legislation must 43 |
---|
| 47 | + | still complete the 30-day review period required by section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia 44 |
---|
| 48 | + | Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-45 |
---|
| 49 | + | 206.02(c)(1)), and will not become law until after the emergency legislation has expired. 46 |
---|
| 50 | + | (d) It is necessary that the provisions of the emergency legislation continue in effect, 47 |
---|
| 51 | + | without interruption, until the temporary legislation is in effect. 48 |
---|
| 52 | + | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 49 |
---|
| 53 | + | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension 50 |
---|
| 54 | + | and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Congressional Review Emergency 51 |
---|
| 55 | + | Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 52 |
---|
| 56 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 53 |
---|