Council | 11/26/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0708 | ||
Council | 11/26/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/30/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/18/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/20/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0941 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 09/16/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |