MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR October 10, 2024 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2- 142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 102 of the Racial Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code § 2-1471.02), I am pleased to nominate the following individual: Gabrielle Parsons Maryland Avenue, NE Washington, DC 20002 (Ward 5) for appointment as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, filling a vacant seat formerly held by Charles Wilson, for a term to end December 17, 2026. Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. Sincerely, Muriel Bowser Mayor ~ ~ n 3 at the request of the Mayor 4 5 6 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 8 9 10 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 12 13 14 15 To confirm the appointment of Gabrielle Parsons to the Racial Equity Advisory Board. 16 17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 18 resolution may be cited as the "Racial Equity Advisory Board Gabrielle Parsons Confirmation 19 Resolution of 2024". 20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of: 21 22 Gabrielle Parsons 23 Maryland A venue, NE 24 Washington, DC 20002 25 (Ward 5) 26 27 as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, established by section 102 of the Racial 28 Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. 29 Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code§ 2-1471.02), filling a vacant seat formerly held by Charles 30 Wilson, for a term to end December 17, 2026. 31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution, 32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor. 33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. GABRIELLE PARSONS, M.ED. CHANGEAGENT|DIVERSITY,EQUITY&INCLUSIONLEADER|EDUCATOR DO Diversity,Equity&InclusivenessConsultant,Am Ernst&Young(EY)|July2021-present *Developandimplementbest-in-classlearning,policiesandprogramsforapproximately9,000internalclients acrosstheUnitedStates,Canada,andUKtoattract,retainandpromoteadiverseandinclusiveworkforce *Partnerwithbusinessleaderstoaddressspecificneedsacrossninemultifunctionalgroups:Brand,Marketing& Communications;EnterpriseSupportServices;Finance;Innovation;Legal;Markets&BusinessDevelopment;Risk &Independence;Neuro-diverseCenterofExcellence;andTalent;supportincreasedID&Eownershipandself- servicewithintheorganizationbygrowingexistinginitiativesandtrainingleadersonSOPsandtools +AdvanceDEIobjectiveswithcomprehensiveanalyticsofID&Edata/metrics,inadditiontorecruitment,talent,and inclusionmetrics,tounderstandinsightsandidentifykeyareasofopportunity *ActasSubjectMatterExpert(SME)onDEItheories,concepts,andpracticestoembedintotheorganization's Initiatives;synergizeandmaintainstrategyandKPISacrossacomplexmatrixtoovercomehurdlestoresults, achievesolutions,andmeettheorganization'sobjectives *Provideleadershipforandactiveengagementwiththeorganization'seightProfessionalNetworks(ERGs)atlocal andvirtualeventstopropelinclusionandscaleimpactfortheAccessibility,Pan-Asian,Black,Latinx,LGBT+, Veteran,andWomen-identifyingcommunities,andothercommunitiesofinterest +AdministerstrategicleadershipforwomenofcolorinCoreBusinessServices;developed,implemented,and facilitatedtwoflagshipprograms:aseriesofleadershipdevelopmentworkshopsinSpring2022,andadrop-in callonwellbeingandresilienceinSpring2023;impacting600uniqueparticipantsacrosstheUnitedStates 1sCoreBusinessServices AssistantDirectorofDiversity&Inclusion IndianaInstituteofTechnology|2020-2021 *ReporteddirectlytotheVicePresidentofInstitutionalDiversity,Equity,andBelongingtoserveapproximately 2,000clients,addressingtheneedsofunderrepresentedandmarginalizedcommunitieswithintheorganization *Developed20+ID&Eco-curriculartrainingsandprogramseachsemesterforstakeholdersatalllevels +Implementedresponse-basedinitiativesforcriticalclimate,socialjustice,andorganizationalissues *Identifiedandsourcedkeypartnershipswithcommunity-basedNGOs,nonprofits,andeducationalorganizatio ‘manageddeliveryofinitiativesandpartnershipecosystem ‘+Administeredleadershipintheprogrammingandstrategiesfortheorganization'sBlackEmployeeResource GroupandBlackStudentUnion ‘+ManagedID&Eoperations,marketing&communications,andbudget;managedteamoffourdirectreports ForeignLanguage&CultureAmbassador;AssistantLangua, TokyoMetropolitanGovernment|2017-2019 +Implementedandmanagedculturalexchangeandforeignlanguageeducationatthelocallevelacrossaportfolio of2,000Japaneseclientstoscaleinternationalization,equity,&inclusioninadvanceofthe2020TokyoOlympics +IdentifiedopportunitiesforEnglishLanguageInstructionprocessimprovement,implementednewstrategiesand ‘mechanisms,resultingingreaterlearningimpactandEnglishlanguageacquisition *Yielded100%acceptancerateofstudentspursuingentryintotop-tieruniversities Teacher ProgramManager,MulticulturalStudentSuccess DePaulUniversity|2015-2017 *Developed,delivered,andassessedanidentity-consciousprogramfor3,000undergraduatewomenofcolor focusedonacademicsuccess,professionaldevelopment,andcommunitybuilding *Integratednewproductsandprocessestostreamlineandimproveprogrammanagementanddelivery *Yieldeda400%increaseinclientsanda200%increaseintouchpoints M.Ed.EducationalLeadership(2017) B.S.Education&SocialPolicy(2015) Capstone:ImprovingMulticulturalAffairs AfricanAmericanStudiesMinorDegree Programming CivicEngagementCertificate DePaulUniversity,Chicago,IL NorthwesternUniversity,Evanston,IL Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 Gabrielle Parsons Ms. G abrielle Parsons is a global, progressive, and inclusive educator, experienced in empowering learners and fostering diversity, equity, inclusion, justice, and belonging. She has approximately 8 years of experience doing diversity, equity, and inclusion ( DEI) work, and her intention in every experience is to interject empathy, strengthen culture and collaboration, and produce big results for all stakeholders. Currently, as a DEI Consultant for Ernst & Young (EY), she develops and implements innovative learning, policies, and programs for 9,000 internal clients across the United States. Prior to this role, she served as a teacher at nonprofit organizations, a DEI program manager in higher education, and as an English language instructor in Japan. Her key competencies include facilitation/training, fostering critical thinking and candid dialogue, research and analysis, technology integration, writing, public speaking, stakeholder engagement, and application of intersectional and global lenses. A Ward 5 resident, Ms. Parsons earned her Bachelor of Science in Education and Social Policy from Northwestern University and her Master of Education in Educational Leadership from DePaul University. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor ______________________________________________________________________________ The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681 To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker From: Betsy Cavendish Date: September 16, 2024 Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Shareefah Al’Uqdah, David Coleman, Kelly Crawford, Kenya Hutton, Yolanda Lewis, Vivian Lowery Derrick, Lamont Mitchell, and Gabrielle Parsons as members of the Racial Equity Advisory Board This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202- 724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. ______________________________ Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish