District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-1014 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 10/10/2024

                             
 
 
MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
 
 
October 10, 2024 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504  
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
 
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 102 of the Racial Equity Achieves Results 
(REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code 
§ 2-1471.02), I am pleased to nominate the following individual:  
 
Gabrielle Parsons 
Maryland Avenue, NE 
Washington, DC 20002 
(Ward 5) 
 
for appointment as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, filling a vacant seat formerly held 
by Charles Wilson, for a term to end December 17, 2026. 
 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process.  
 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
 
Sincerely,  
 
 
 
Muriel Bowser 
Mayor  ~ 	~	n 
3 
at the request of the Mayor 
4 
5 
6 	A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
7 
8 
9 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To confirm the appointment of Gabrielle Parsons to the Racial Equity Advisory Board. 
16 
17 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Racial Equity Advisory Board Gabrielle Parsons Confirmation 
19 Resolution of 2024". 
20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment 	of: 
21 
22 	Gabrielle Parsons 
23 	Maryland A venue, NE 
24 	Washington, 
DC 20002 
25 	(Ward 5) 
26 
27 
as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, established by section 	102 of the Racial 
28 Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act 	of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. 
29 Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code§ 2-1471.02), filling a vacant seat formerly held by Charles 
30 Wilson, for a term to end December 	17, 2026. 
31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and 	to the Office of the Mayor. 
33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.   GABRIELLE PARSONS, M.ED.
CHANGEAGENT|DIVERSITY,EQUITY&INCLUSIONLEADER|EDUCATOR
DO
Diversity,Equity&InclusivenessConsultant,Am
Ernst&Young(EY)|July2021-present
*Developandimplementbest-in-classlearning,policiesandprogramsforapproximately9,000internalclients
acrosstheUnitedStates,Canada,andUKtoattract,retainandpromoteadiverseandinclusiveworkforce
*Partnerwithbusinessleaderstoaddressspecificneedsacrossninemultifunctionalgroups:Brand,Marketing&
Communications;EnterpriseSupportServices;Finance;Innovation;Legal;Markets&BusinessDevelopment;Risk
&Independence;Neuro-diverseCenterofExcellence;andTalent;supportincreasedID&Eownershipandself-
servicewithintheorganizationbygrowingexistinginitiativesandtrainingleadersonSOPsandtools
+AdvanceDEIobjectiveswithcomprehensiveanalyticsofID&Edata/metrics,inadditiontorecruitment,talent,and
inclusionmetrics,tounderstandinsightsandidentifykeyareasofopportunity
*ActasSubjectMatterExpert(SME)onDEItheories,concepts,andpracticestoembedintotheorganization's
Initiatives;synergizeandmaintainstrategyandKPISacrossacomplexmatrixtoovercomehurdlestoresults,
achievesolutions,andmeettheorganization'sobjectives
*Provideleadershipforandactiveengagementwiththeorganization'seightProfessionalNetworks(ERGs)atlocal
andvirtualeventstopropelinclusionandscaleimpactfortheAccessibility,Pan-Asian,Black,Latinx,LGBT+,
Veteran,andWomen-identifyingcommunities,andothercommunitiesofinterest
+AdministerstrategicleadershipforwomenofcolorinCoreBusinessServices;developed,implemented,and
facilitatedtwoflagshipprograms:aseriesofleadershipdevelopmentworkshopsinSpring2022,andadrop-in
callonwellbeingandresilienceinSpring2023;impacting600uniqueparticipantsacrosstheUnitedStates
1sCoreBusinessServices 
 
AssistantDirectorofDiversity&Inclusion
IndianaInstituteofTechnology|2020-2021
*ReporteddirectlytotheVicePresidentofInstitutionalDiversity,Equity,andBelongingtoserveapproximately
2,000clients,addressingtheneedsofunderrepresentedandmarginalizedcommunitieswithintheorganization
*Developed20+ID&Eco-curriculartrainingsandprogramseachsemesterforstakeholdersatalllevels
+Implementedresponse-basedinitiativesforcriticalclimate,socialjustice,andorganizationalissues
*Identifiedandsourcedkeypartnershipswithcommunity-basedNGOs,nonprofits,andeducationalorganizatio
‘manageddeliveryofinitiativesandpartnershipecosystem
‘+Administeredleadershipintheprogrammingandstrategiesfortheorganization'sBlackEmployeeResource
GroupandBlackStudentUnion
‘+ManagedID&Eoperations,marketing&communications,andbudget;managedteamoffourdirectreports
 
ForeignLanguage&CultureAmbassador;AssistantLangua,
TokyoMetropolitanGovernment|2017-2019
+Implementedandmanagedculturalexchangeandforeignlanguageeducationatthelocallevelacrossaportfolio
of2,000Japaneseclientstoscaleinternationalization,equity,&inclusioninadvanceofthe2020TokyoOlympics
+IdentifiedopportunitiesforEnglishLanguageInstructionprocessimprovement,implementednewstrategiesand
‘mechanisms,resultingingreaterlearningimpactandEnglishlanguageacquisition
*Yielded100%acceptancerateofstudentspursuingentryintotop-tieruniversities
Teacher 
ProgramManager,MulticulturalStudentSuccess
DePaulUniversity|2015-2017
*Developed,delivered,andassessedanidentity-consciousprogramfor3,000undergraduatewomenofcolor
focusedonacademicsuccess,professionaldevelopment,andcommunitybuilding
*Integratednewproductsandprocessestostreamlineandimproveprogrammanagementanddelivery
*Yieldeda400%increaseinclientsanda200%increaseintouchpoints
M.Ed.EducationalLeadership(2017) B.S.Education&SocialPolicy(2015)
Capstone:ImprovingMulticulturalAffairs AfricanAmericanStudiesMinorDegree
Programming	CivicEngagementCertificate
DePaulUniversity,Chicago,IL NorthwesternUniversity,Evanston,IL  Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, 	Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
Gabrielle Parsons 
Ms. G abrielle Parsons is a global, progressive, and inclusive educator, 
experienced in empowering learners and fostering diversity, equity, 
inclusion, justice, and belonging. She has approximately 8 years of 
experience doing diversity, equity, and inclusion (	DEI) work, and her 
intention in every experience is to interject empathy, strengthen culture 
and collaboration, and produce big results for all stakeholders. 
Currently, as a DEI Consultant for Ernst & Young (EY), she develops 
and implements innovative learning, policies, and programs for 9,000 
internal clients across the United States. Prior to this role, she served as 
a teacher at nonprofit organizations, a DEI program manager in higher 
education, and as an English language instructor in Japan. 
Her key competencies include facilitation/training, fostering critical thinking and candid dialogue, 
research and analysis, technology integration, writing, public speaking, stakeholder engagement, 
and application of intersectional and global lenses. 
A Ward 5 resident, Ms. Parsons earned her Bachelor of Science in Education and Social Policy 
from Northwestern University and her Master of Education in Educational Leadership from 
DePaul University.  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From: Betsy Cavendish 
Date: September 16, 2024 
Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Shareefah Al’Uqdah, David 
Coleman, Kelly Crawford, Kenya Hutton, Yolanda Lewis, Vivian Lowery 
Derrick, Lamont Mitchell, and Gabrielle Parsons as members of the Racial Equity 
Advisory Board 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish