District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-1019 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 10/10/2024

                             
 
 
MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
 
 
October 10, 2024 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504  
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
 
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 102 of the Racial Equity Achieves Results 
(REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code 
§ 2-1471.02), I am pleased to nominate the following individual:  
 
Vivian Lowery Derryck 
Oregon Avenue, NW  
Washington, DC 20015  
(Ward 4)  
 
for reappointment as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, for a term to end December 17, 
2026. 
 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process.  
 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
 
Sincerely,  
 
 
 
Muriel Bowser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
~~~ 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT 	OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To confirm the reappointment of Vivian Lowery Derryck to the Racial Equity Advisory Board. 
16 
17 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Racial Equity Advisory Board Vivian Lowery Derryck 
19 Confirmation Resolution of 2024". 
20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment 	of: 
21 
22 	Vivian Lowery Derryck 
23 	Oregon A venue, NW 
24 	Washington, DC 20015 
25 	(Ward 4) 
26 
27 
as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, established by section 	102 of the Racial 
28 Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act 	of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. 
29 Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code§ 2-1471.02), for a term to end December 
17, 2026. 
30 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
31 upon its adoption, to the nominee and 	to the Office of the Mayor. 
32 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  AWARDS 	Guggenheim Humanitarian Award; the National Council of Negro Women 
Martin Luther King Service Award; the UNICEF Achievement Award; the 
African Union African Women of Excellence Award; the 2019 UN National 
Capital Area Human Rights Award. She has been named a Knight of the 
National Order of Mali by the Malian government; named a Purpose Prize 
Fellow; and awarded an honorary doctorate. Two endowed Fellowships in 
Sustainable Development established in her name at Howard University. 
Vivian Lowery
Derryck 
Fo	The
Bridges Institute
XXXXXXX //  Washington, DC // XXX-XXX-XXXX //  XXX@XXXX.XXX 
PROFILE 	Bachelor of Arts in Political Science - Chatham College 
Master of International Affairs - Columbia University 
EXPERIENCE Founder and President Emerita of the Bridges Institute (Bridges), a 
nonprofit that works to strengthen African governance and 
democracy. Bridges’ programs bring together continental Africans 
and the Diaspora to examine issues of governance, corruption, race, 
equity, and women’s rights to develop strategies for strengthening 
citizen engagement in building robust democracies. 
Deputy Assistant Secretary for Equal Employment Opportunity and 
Civil Rights at the U.S. Department of State; the Senate-confirmed 
Assistant Administrator for Africa at USAID where she managed a $1 
billion portfolio; president of the African American Institute; 	executive vice president of the National Council of Negro Women 
(NCNW); the first vice-president of the National Democratic 
Institute; and senior vice-president of the former $850 million non-
profit, the Academy for Educational Development.  Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvan ia Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
Vivian Lowery Derryck 
Ms. Vivian Lowery Derryck 	is the founder and President Emerita of the 
Bridges Institute (Bridges), a nonprofit that works to strengthen African 
governance and democracy. Bridges’ programs bring together 
continental Africans and the Diaspora to examine issues of governance, 
corruption, race, equity, and women’s rights to develop strategies for 
strengthening citizen engagement in building robust democracies. In 
2020, following George Floyd’s murder, Bridges launched a new 
initiative, Concerned Citizens Defending Democracy, which focuses on 
strengthening U.S. democracy, social justice, racial healing and 
reconciliation. She is also a current member of the Racial Equity 
Advisory Board. 
The 2023, George Washington University-endowed Vivian Lowery Derryck/Bridges Institute 
African Lecture and Meeting Series ensures annual dialogue on African democracy and 
governance in perpetuity. 
Ms. Derryck founded the Bridges Institute in 2009 when she was an Inaugural Fellow in Harvard’s 
Advanced Leadership Initiative. Prior to Bridges, Ms. Derryck worked in and out of government 
in more than 35 countries in Africa, Asia, and the Caribbean. She served as the Deputy Assistant 
Secretary for Equal Employment Opportunity and Civil Rights at the U.S. Department of State; 
the Senate-confirmed Assistant Administrator for Africa at USAID where she managed a $1 billion 
portfolio; president of the African American Institute; executive vice president of the National 
Council of Negro Women (NCNW); the first vice-president of the National Democratic Institute; 
and senior vice-president of the former $850 million non-profit, the Academy for Educational 
Development. 
Ms. Derryck has received several accolades, including the Guggenheim Humanitarian Award; the 
National Council of Negro Women Martin Luther King Service Award; the UNICEF Achievement 
Award; the African Union African Women of Excellence Award; the 2019 UN National Capital 
Area Human Rights Award. She has been named a Knight of the National Order of Mali by the 
Malian government; named a Purpose Prize Fellow; and awarded an honorary doctorate. She also 
has two endowed Fellowships in Sustainable Development established in her name at Howard 
University. 
A Ward 4 resident, Ms. Vivian Lowery Derryck earned her Bachelor of Arts in Political Science 
from Chatham College and a Master of International Affairs from Columbia University.   GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From: Betsy Cavendish 
Date: September 16, 2024 
Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Shareefah Al’Uqdah, David 
Coleman, Kelly Crawford, Kenya Hutton, Yolanda Lewis, Vivian Lowery 
Derrick, Lamont Mitchell, and Gabrielle Parsons as members of the Racial Equity 
Advisory Board 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish