District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-1022 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/17/2024

                     
 
 
MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
 
 
October 17, 2024 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504  
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
 
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 4 of the Commission on Arts and 
Humanities Act, effective October 21, 1975 (D.C. Law 1-22; D.C. Official Code § 39-203), I am 
pleased to nominate the following individual:  
 
Ms. Maggie O’Neill 
Rhode Island Avenue, NW 
Washington, DC 20001 
(Ward 2) 
 
for appointment as a public member of the Commission on the Arts and Humanities, filling a vacant 
seat formerly held by Amy Bormet, for the remainder of an unexpired term to end June 30, 2025. 
 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process.  
 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
 
Sincerely,  
 
 
 
Muriel Bowser 
Mayor  1 
2 	hairman Phil Mendelson 
3 
at the request of the Mayor 
4 
5 
6 	A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
7 
8 
9 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To confirm the appointment of Maggie O'Neill to the Commission on the Arts and Humanities. 
16 
17 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Commission on the Arts and Humanities Maggie O'Neill 
19 Confirmation Resolution of 2024". 
20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment 	of: 
21 
22 	Maggie O'Neill 
23 	Rhode Island A venue, NW 
24 	Washington, 
DC 20001 
25 	(Ward 2) 
26 
27 as a public member of the Commission on the Arts and Humanities, established by section 4 	of 
28 the Commission on the Arts and Humanities Act, effective October 21, 1975 (D.C. Law 1-22; 
29 D.C. Official Code§ 39-203), filling a vacant seat formerly held by Amy Bormet, for the 
30 remainder of an unexpired term to end June 30, 2025. 
31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 	of the Mayor. 
33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  Maggie O'Neill 
   
 
"I believe color is the answer. I believe art creates the most unlikely and profound connection between people all over the world. I was put on this planet 
to create art, create spaces, and create connection and conversation through my work." 
 
Professional Summary 
Creative and dynamic professional with over 20 years of experience as a cultural leader, artist, and designer in Washington, D.C. 
Demonstrated success in supporting the city's creative community through innovative design projects, community-focused initiatives, 
and public art exhibitions. Entrepreneurial spirit with a proven track record of transforming commercial spaces, including the iconic 
Willard Hotel, and contributing to the cultural landscape of the nation's capital. 
 
Notable Achievements and Recognition 
• Personally delivered a portrait to President Obama in 2012. 
• Featured on embassy walls globally, as well as in prestigious hotels like Sofitel, Four Seasons, and Rosewood. 
• Named the 2018 Official Artist of the National Cherry Blossom Festival. 
• Created immersive pop-up art activations, such as cherry blossoms made from D.C. parking tickets. 
 
Public Art Projects 
• "The Women Who Will" (Pennsylvania Avenue, 50 x 50 mural commissioned by Tishman Speyer and Lyft to celebrate 
Women's History Month). 
• "Together" (Collaborative mural inspired by the 2017 Women's March, supported by Shaw Main Streets & Artbox DC, and 
the DC Commission on the Arts and Humanities Public Art Building Communities grant program). 
 
Professional Experience 
SWATCHROOM, Washington, D.C. 
Founder and Creative Director 
• Led a creative design firm with a robust portfolio of 55+ commercial spaces in the District, including restaurants and iconic 
hotels. 
• Spearheaded the complete reimagining of the historic Willard Hotel. 
• Executed community-focused projects, such as pop-ups and murals, designed to be inclusive and spark open dialogue. 
• Positioned as a cultural leader at the intersection of arts and hospitality. 
 
Vote for Your Daughter (VFYD), Washington, D.C. 
Founder and Creative Director 
• Initiated and led the VFYD public art exhibit and campaign, aiming to defend the rights of American women and girls. 
• Currently fundraising to create 51 statues of young girls with life-sized fiberglass figures, collaborating with 51 selected artists. 
• Utilizing art as a vehicle to educate voters and raise awareness of issues affecting women and girls.    
Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
Maggie O’Neill 
 
Ms. Maggie O’Neill is an artist, designer, and creative entrepreneur 
based in the District of Columbia. Living and working in the 
neighborhood of Shaw, her work is inspired by local landscapes and 
cultural icons, her travels abroad, notable women, and fashion. In 
2012, Ms. O’Neill had the honor of personally delivering a portrait to 
President Obama, and in 2014 her “DC Uncle Sam” was featured on 
the front page of The New York Times . 
She is the co-founder of SWATCHROOM, a full-service design, art 
and fabrication studio. Through SWATCHROOM, she’s designed 
notable commercial spaces and private residencies throughout the Mid-	Atlantic, including more 
than twenty restaurants and the offices for incubator 1776 in Washington, New York, and Dubai. 
She has also designed custom installation pieces for real estate developers, private commissions, 
and companies like Twitter and Microsoft. 
Ms. O’Neill is a fine artist, best known for her iconic pop impressionistic paintings of iconic 
Washington, D.C. landmarks and people, like her “Pop Capitol” and “Flynn’s Jefferson 
Memorial.” She’s been the featured speaker for Creative Mornings DC, a two-	time winner of the 
design category for DC Inno’s “50 on Fire,” named a “Woman of Influence” by Capitol File in 
2015, and her art was featured on the cover of DC Magazine’s 	December 2016 issue, among other 
accolades. 
In addition to her work, Ms. O’Neill is focused on giving back to her community and paying it 
forward. She is the founder of SUPERFIERCE, a national traveling art exhibit that highlights 
female artists, benefits local charities and mentors aspiring artists. Proceeds from her artwork have 
benefited organizations like Research Down Syndrome, Autism Speaks, Habitat for Humanity, 
DC Central Kitchen, and Project Soar. Additionally, she is active in her local community as a 
board member of Shaw Main Streets, a commercial revitalization and historic preservation non-
profit. 
A Ward 2 resident, Ms. O’Neill earned her Bachelor of Science in Political Science from the 
College of the Holy Cross.  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
To: 
From: 
Date: 
Subject: 
Tomas Talamante, S teve 
Walker 
Betsy Cavendish 
October 16, 2024 
Leg
al sufficiency review of the 	Resolution nominating Maggie 	O’Neill as a 
member of the Commission on the Arts and Humanities  
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolutions and
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call me at 202-724-7681. 
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish