Council | 12/09/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-1050 | ||
Council | 12/04/2024 | Public Hearing | ||
Council | 12/04/2024 | Roundtable Hearing | ||
Council | 12/03/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 12/03/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/12/2024 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 11/08/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-1050 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/28/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |