7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
| 4 | + | 1 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 6 | + | 3 |
---|
| 7 | + | 4 |
---|
| 8 | + | 5 |
---|
| 9 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 |
---|
| 10 | + | ________ 7 |
---|
| 11 | + | 8 |
---|
| 12 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 |
---|
| 13 | + | ______________________ 10 |
---|
| 14 | + | 11 |
---|
| 15 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Rental Housing 12 |
---|
| 16 | + | Act of 1985 to enact a moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance of, 13 |
---|
| 17 | + | certificates of assurance associated with District rent stabilization laws . 14 |
---|
| 18 | + | 15 |
---|
| 19 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 16 |
---|
| 20 | + | may be cited as the “Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Emergency Declaration 17 |
---|
| 21 | + | Resolution of 2024”. 18 |
---|
| 22 | + | Sec. 2. (a) Section 221 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 2985 ( D.C. 19 |
---|
| 23 | + | Law 6-10; D.C. Official Code § 42- 3502.21) allows owners of housing accommodations to apply 20 |
---|
| 24 | + | for certificates of assurance from the Mayor , which would provide that in the event their 21 |
---|
| 25 | + | properties become subject to any rent stabilization , the owners would recover in the form of a 22 |
---|
| 26 | + | District real estate tax credit the difference between the annual fair market rent s and the annual 23 |
---|
| 27 | + | amount of stabilized rent s the owners receive from the tenants in the housing accommodations . 24 |
---|
| 28 | + | (b) Because the certificate of assurance entitlement lasts for as long as the properties 25 |
---|
| 29 | + | remain housing accommodations , the entitlement may create a potentially prohibitive fiscal 26 |
---|
| 30 | + | impact on future reform legislation . 27 |
---|
| 31 | + | (c) Implementation barriers and concerns kept the program from ever being fully 28 |
---|
| 32 | + | operational. 29 |
---|
| 33 | + | (d) On September 22, 2020, the Council passed the Certificate of Assurance Moratorium 30 |
---|
| 34 | + | 2 |
---|
9 | | - | 25-705 |
---|
10 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | November 12, 2024 |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Rental Housing |
---|
15 | | - | Act of 1985 to enact a moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance of, |
---|
16 | | - | certificates of assurance associated with District rent stabilization laws . |
---|
17 | | - | |
---|
18 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution |
---|
19 | | - | may be cited as the “Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Emergency Declaration |
---|
20 | | - | Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
21 | | - | |
---|
22 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) Section 221 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 2985 ( D.C. |
---|
23 | | - | Law 6-10; D.C. Official Code § 42- 3502.21), allows owners of housing accommodations to |
---|
24 | | - | apply for certificates of assurance from the Mayor, which provide that in the event the owner’s |
---|
25 | | - | properties become subject to rent stabilization , the owners would recover , in the form of a |
---|
26 | | - | District real estate tax credit, the difference between the annual fair market rent s and the annual |
---|
27 | | - | amount of stabilized rent s the owners receive from the tenants in the housing accommodations |
---|
28 | | - | (“program”). |
---|
29 | | - | (b) Because the certificate of assurance entitlement lasts for as long as the properties |
---|
30 | | - | remain housing accommodations , the entitlement may create a potentially prohibitive fiscal |
---|
31 | | - | impact on future reform legislation . |
---|
32 | | - | (c) Implementation barriers and concerns kept the program from ever being fully |
---|
33 | | - | operational. |
---|
34 | | - | (d) On September 22, 2020, the Council passed the Certificate of Assurance Moratorium |
---|
35 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2020 ( D.C. Act 23- 454; 67 DCR 13216), which placed an |
---|
36 | | - | emergency moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance of, c ertificates of assurance |
---|
37 | | - | to owners of housing accommodations. |
---|
38 | | - | (e) The Council has extended the moratorium through subsequent emergency and |
---|
39 | | - | temporary acts. |
---|
40 | | - | (f) The Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 is |
---|
41 | | - | necessary to maintain the status quo while permanent legislation is considered. |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
43 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
44 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Certificate of Assurance Moratorium |
---|
45 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
46 | | - | |
---|
47 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 36 | + | Emergency Amendment Act of 2020 (Bill 23 -0900), which placed an emergency moratorium on 31 |
---|
| 37 | + | applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance of, certificates of a ssurance to owners of housing 32 |
---|
| 38 | + | accommodations. 33 |
---|
| 39 | + | (e) The Council has extended the moratorium through subsequent emergency and 34 |
---|
| 40 | + | temporary acts, including most recently the Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Second 35 |
---|
| 41 | + | Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, effective April 10, 2024 (D.C. Law 25- 152), 36 |
---|
| 42 | + | which will expire on November 21, 2024. 37 |
---|
| 43 | + | (f) The Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 is 38 |
---|
| 44 | + | necessary to maintain the status quo while permanent legislation is considered. 39 |
---|
| 45 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 40 |
---|
| 46 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 41 |
---|
| 47 | + | Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a 42 |
---|
| 48 | + | single reading. 43 |
---|
| 49 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 44 |
---|