District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-1067 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/18/2024

                    November 18, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council of the District o f Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue N	W, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004-3003 
Dear Chairman M endelson: 
Pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration by the Council of the District of Columbia, 
t
he (a) Council Contract Summary for the Agreement t	o Enter into a Long-T	erm Subsidy Contract (“ALTSC”) between 
t
he District of Columbia Housing Authority (“DCHA”) and 2401 25th Street LLC, and (b) propose	d Local Rent 
Supplement Program Contract N	o. 2024-L RSP-09A with 2401 25th Street LLC Approval Resolution of 2024. DCHA 
proposes to provide a housing subsidy 
to the Owner in the amount of $403,360.27 annually for a multi-y	ear term of 
t
wenty (20) years, in support of the District’	s Local Rent Supplement 	Program (“LRSP”) to provide 	twenty-four (24) 
a
ffordable housing units at Wagner Senior located at 2401 25th Street, SE.  
As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding the propose d LTSC.  In order to facilita
te a 
response to any questions concerning this ALTSC, please have your staff contact my 	Chief of Staff Alethea McNair at 
(202) 993-8190.
I look forward to your favorable consideration 
of this proposed ALTSC agreement. 
Sincerely, 
Keith Pettigrew 
Executive Director, District of Columbia Housing Authority 
Enclosures 
KP/hg 
cc:  Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council     1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
32 
33 
;4f~ 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
at the request 
of District of 
Columbia Housing Authority 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 20 years in support 
of the District's Local Rent Supplement Program 	to fund housing costs associated with 
affordable housing units for Contract No. 2024-LRSP-09A with 2401 
25
th 
Street LLC for 
program units at Wagner Senior located at 2401 25th Street, SE. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited 
as the "Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-09A 
with 2401 
25
th 
Street LLC Approval Resolution 	of 2024". 
Sec. 2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title II 
of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support 
Act 
of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income 
households in the District. The passage 
of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program 
("LRSP"), a program designed to provide affordable housing and supportive services to 
extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless or 
in need of 
supportive services, such 	as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based, 
tenant-based, and sponsored-based LRSP affordable housing units. The BSA provided for the 
District 
of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") 	to administer the LRSP on behalf 	of the 
District. 
{0030893 
-} 1  {0030893 -}2 
(b)In September of 2021, the District of Columbia’s Department of Housing and 1 
Community Development (“DHCD”) issued a Request for Proposals (“RFP”) regarding the 2 
availability of funds from multiple district agencies, including DCHA, DHCD, the Department 3 
of Behavioral Health, the Department of Human Services, and the District of Columbia Housing 4 
Finance Agency.  Of the twenty-one (21) total proposals received, eleven (11) developers were 5 
chosen to work with DCHA and other District agencies to develop affordable housing and 6 
permanent supportive housing units for extremely low-income families making zero to thirty 7 
percent (30%) of the area’s median income, as well as the chronically homeless and individuals 8 
with mental or physical disabilities. Upon approval of the contract by the Council, DCHA will 9 
enter into an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract (“ALTSC”) with the selected 10 
housing providers under the LRSP for housing services. 11 
(c) There exists an immediate need to approve the long-term subsidy contract with 240112 
25
th
 Street LLC under the LRSP in order to provide long-term affordable housing units for 13 extremely low-income households fo
r units located at 2401 25
th
 Street, SE. 
14 
(d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an ALTSC between the District15 
of Columbia Housing Authority and 2401 25th Street LLC with respect to the payment of a 16 
rental subsidy and allows the owner to lease the rehabilitated units at Wagner Senior and house 17 
extremely low-income households with incomes at 30% or less of the area median income. 18 
Sec. 3.  Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Ho	me Rule Act, approved 19 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.51), and section 202 of the 20 
Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-	371; D.C. 21 
Official Code § 2-	352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with 2401 25th Street LLC to 22  {0030893 -}3 
p
rovide an op erating subsidy in support twenty	-four (24) af fordable 
housing units in an initial 1 
amount not to exceed $403,360.27 annually. 2 
Sec. 4. Tra
nsmittal.  3 
The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of 4 
Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor. 5 
Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement.  6 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief  Financial Officer as the 7 
fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 8 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 9 
Sec. 6. Effective date.  10 
This resolution shall take effect immediately. 11