District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-1067 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-A RESOLUTION
7-
8-25-765
9-
1+November 18, 2024
2+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
3+Chairman
4+Council of the District o f Columbia
5+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue N W, Suite 504
6+Washington, DC 20004-3003
7+Dear Chairman M endelson:
8+Pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration by the Council of the District of Columbia,
9+t
10+he (a) Council Contract Summary for the Agreement t o Enter into a Long-T erm Subsidy Contract (“ALTSC”) between
11+t
12+he District of Columbia Housing Authority (“DCHA”) and 2401 25th Street LLC, and (b) propose d Local Rent
13+Supplement Program Contract N o. 2024-L RSP-09A with 2401 25th Street LLC Approval Resolution of 2024. DCHA
14+proposes to provide a housing subsidy
15+to the Owner in the amount of $403,360.27 annually for a multi-y ear term of
16+t
17+wenty (20) years, in support of the District’ s Local Rent Supplement Program (“LRSP”) to provide twenty-four (24)
18+a
19+ffordable housing units at Wagner Senior located at 2401 25th Street, SE.
20+As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding the propose d LTSC. In order to facilita
21+te a
22+response to any questions concerning this ALTSC, please have your staff contact my Chief of Staff Alethea McNair at
23+(202) 993-8190.
24+I look forward to your favorable consideration
25+of this proposed ALTSC agreement.
26+Sincerely,
27+Keith Pettigrew
28+Executive Director, District of Columbia Housing Authority
29+Enclosures
30+KP/hg
31+cc: Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council 1
32+2
33+3
34+4
35+5
36+6
37+7
38+8
39+9
40+10
41+11
42+12
43+13
44+14
45+15
46+16
47+17
48+18
49+19
50+20
51+21
52+22
53+23
54+24
55+25
56+26
57+27
58+28
59+29
60+30
61+31
62+32
63+33
64+;4f~
65+Chairman Phil Mendelson
66+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
67+at the request
68+of District of
69+Columbia Housing Authority
1070 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
11-
12-December 17, 2024
13-
1471 To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 20 years in support
15-of the District’s Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with
16-affordable housing units for Contract No. 2024 -LRSP-09A with 2401 25th Street LLC
17-for program units at Wagner Senior located at 2401 25th Street, SE.
18-
72+of the District's Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with
73+affordable housing units for Contract No. 2024-LRSP-09A with 2401
74+25
75+th
76+Street LLC for
77+program units at Wagner Senior located at 2401 25th Street, SE.
1978 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
20-resolution may be cited as the “Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024- LRSP-09A
21-with 2401 25
79+resolution may be cited
80+as the "Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-09A
81+with 2401
82+25
2283 th
23- Street LLC Approval Resolution of 2024” .
24-
25-Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the Ho me Rule Act (D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.51)
26-and section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. 2024-
27-LRSP-09A, a long- term subsidy contract, with 2401 25th Street LLC to provide an operating
28-subsidy in support of 24 affordable housing units in an initial amount not to exceed
29-$403,360.27 annually.
30- Sec. 3. Transmittal.
31- The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of
32-Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.
33- Sec.45. Fiscal impact statement.
34-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal
35-impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
36-approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a).
37- Sec. 5. Effective date.
38-This resolution shall take effect immediately.
84+Street LLC Approval Resolution of 2024".
85+Sec. 2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title II
86+of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support
87+Act
88+of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income
89+households in the District. The passage
90+of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program
91+("LRSP"), a program designed to provide affordable housing and supportive services to
92+extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless or
93+in need of
94+supportive services, such as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based,
95+tenant-based, and sponsored-based LRSP affordable housing units. The BSA provided for the
96+District
97+of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") to administer the LRSP on behalf of the
98+District.
99+{0030893
100+-} 1 {0030893 -}2
101+(b)In September of 2021, the District of Columbia’s Department of Housing and 1
102+Community Development (“DHCD”) issued a Request for Proposals (“RFP”) regarding the 2
103+availability of funds from multiple district agencies, including DCHA, DHCD, the Department 3
104+of Behavioral Health, the Department of Human Services, and the District of Columbia Housing 4
105+Finance Agency. Of the twenty-one (21) total proposals received, eleven (11) developers were 5
106+chosen to work with DCHA and other District agencies to develop affordable housing and 6
107+permanent supportive housing units for extremely low-income families making zero to thirty 7
108+percent (30%) of the area’s median income, as well as the chronically homeless and individuals 8
109+with mental or physical disabilities. Upon approval of the contract by the Council, DCHA will 9
110+enter into an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract (“ALTSC”) with the selected 10
111+housing providers under the LRSP for housing services. 11
112+(c) There exists an immediate need to approve the long-term subsidy contract with 240112
113+25
114+th
115+ Street LLC under the LRSP in order to provide long-term affordable housing units for 13 extremely low-income households fo
116+r units located at 2401 25
117+th
118+ Street, SE.
119+14
120+(d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an ALTSC between the District15
121+of Columbia Housing Authority and 2401 25th Street LLC with respect to the payment of a 16
122+rental subsidy and allows the owner to lease the rehabilitated units at Wagner Senior and house 17
123+extremely low-income households with incomes at 30% or less of the area median income. 18
124+Sec. 3. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Ho me Rule Act, approved 19
125+December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.51), and section 202 of the 20
126+Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18- 371; D.C. 21
127+Official Code § 2- 352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with 2401 25th Street LLC to 22 {0030893 -}3
128+p
129+rovide an op erating subsidy in support twenty -four (24) af fordable
130+housing units in an initial 1
131+amount not to exceed $403,360.27 annually. 2
132+Sec. 4. Tra
133+nsmittal. 3
134+The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of 4
135+Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor. 5
136+Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 6
137+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the 7
138+fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 8
139+approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 9
140+Sec. 6. Effective date. 10
141+This resolution shall take effect immediately. 11