| 4 | + | Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | to authorize the Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development to provide grant 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | funding to a technology incubator in the District. 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | Technology Incubator Grant Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On July 9, 2024, the Council unanimously approved the Deputy Mayor for 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | Planning and Economic Development Technology Incubator Grant Emergency Act of 2024 (D.C. 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | Act 25-546; 71 DCR 9982)(“emergency measure”). The emergency measure expired on October 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | 24, 2024. 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | (b) On September 17, 2024, the Council unanimously approved the Deputy Mayor for 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | Planning and Economic Development Technology Incubator Grant Temporary Act of 2024 (D.C. 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | Act 25-563)(“temporary measure”) on second reading. The temporary measure has yet to 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | complete congressional review. Therefore, this congressional review emergency is necessary to 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency measure and the effective date 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | of the temporary measure. 32 2 |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-727 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | December 3, 2024 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
16 | | - | to authorize the Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development to provide grant |
---|
17 | | - | funding to a technology incubator in the District. |
---|
18 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
19 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development |
---|
20 | | - | Technology Incubator Grant Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
21 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On July 9, 2024, the Council unanimously approved the Deputy Mayor for |
---|
22 | | - | Planning and Economic Development Technology Incubator Grant Emergency Amendment Act |
---|
23 | | - | of 2024, effective July 26, 2024 (D.C. Act 25- 546; 71 DCR 9982)(“Emergency Act”). The |
---|
24 | | - | Emergency Act expired on October 24, 2024. |
---|
25 | | - | (b) On September 17, 2024, the Council unanimously approved the Deputy Mayor for |
---|
26 | | - | Planning and Economic Development Technology Incubator Grant Temporary Amendment Act |
---|
27 | | - | of 2024, effective November 27, 2024 (D.C. Law 25-224; 71 DCR 12342) (“Temporary Act”) on |
---|
28 | | - | second reading. The Temporary Act completed congressional review following the expiration of |
---|
29 | | - | the Emergency Act. Therefore, congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in |
---|
30 | | - | the law between the expiration of the emergency measure and the effective date of the temporary |
---|
31 | | - | measure. |
---|
32 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
33 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development Technology Incubator Grant Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
34 | | - | |
---|
35 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 36 | + | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 33 |
---|
| 37 | + | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Deputy Mayor for Planning and 34 |
---|
| 38 | + | Economic Development Technology Incubator Grant Congressional Review Emergency Act of 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 37 |
---|