Council | 03/25/2025 | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is May 20, 2025 | ||
Council | 03/21/2025 | Act A26-0026 Published in DC Register Vol 72 and Page 003120 | ||
Council | 03/19/2025 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A26-0026 | ||
Council | 03/18/2025 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/04/2025 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 18, 2025 | ||
Council | 02/18/2025 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 02/07/2025 | Notice of Intent to Act on B26-0088 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
Council | 02/04/2025 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 02/03/2025 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |