District Of Columbia 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B26-0217 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/31/2025

                               
 
   
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
March 31, 2025  
 
Nyasha Smith, Secretary  
Council of the District of Columbia  
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW 
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Secretary Smith,  
 
Today, I am introducing the Transparency Is Accountability Amendment Act of 2025. Please 
find enclosed a signed copy of the legislation. 
 
One of the most important forms of accountability for government operations is transparency, 
and one of the principal mechanisms for delivering that transparency is the District of Columbia 
Freedom of Information Act, or FOIA, D.C. Official Code § 2-531 et seq. While this law in 
theory provides members of the public—including the press—access to public records, the 
reality of FOIA practice is somewhat different. Far too often, government records pertaining to 
basic government functions or that shed light on government misconduct are withheld—
depriving the public of critical information and frustrating the transparency and accountability 
objectives of FOIA.  
 
The Transparency Is Accountability Amendment Act of 2025 makes targeted changes to D.C.’s 
FOIA to enhance the ability of the public to obtain critical information about agency operations 
and to incentivize efficient and responsible government conduct through greater transparency. 
This legislation will:   
 
(1) Clarify that 911 call records cannot be withheld under the personal privacy exemption 
where the name and number of the caller is redacted (while also allowing a caller to 
provide written consent for this information to be disclosed); 
 
(2) Ensure that often used exemption for inter-agency and intra-agency memoranda cannot 
be used to withhold information regarding government misconduct, including 
discrimination, violations of criminal law, and sexual harassment;  
     
 
2 
(3) Require agencies to identify a specific, foreseeable harm when asserting an exemption to 
disclosure and to consider discretionary releases of information when the likelihood of 
significant harm occurring is low and the public interest in the information is high;
1
 and 
 
(4) Require the disclosure of information withheld under the deliberative process if the 
public’s interest in disclosure outweighs the District’s interest in secrecy.  
 
Enacting these changes will ensure that District residents are better equipped to hold their elected 
and appointed representatives accountable, and the prospect of such transparency will motivate 
public servants to hold themselves to the highest ethical standards.  
Please contact my Deputy Chief of Staff, Conor Shaw, at cshaw@dccouncil.gov if you have any 
questions about this legislation. 
 
Sincerely,  
 
 
 
 
Zachary Parker  
Ward 5 Councilmember  
 
1
 These changes reflect current federal FOIA law and practice prompted by the FOIA 
Improvement Act of 2016 (P.L. 114-185) as well as guidelines issued by United States Attorney 
General Merrick Garland on March 15, 2022.   
 
 1 
  	______________________________ 2 
   Councilmember Zachary Parker 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_________________________ 8 
 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 
 11 
_________________________ 12 
 13 
 14 
To amend the Freedom of Information Act of 1976 to improve public access to critical records, 15 
including 911 transcripts and recordings, documents regarding government misconduct, 16 
and deliberative materials when the public interest in disclosure outweighs the District’s 17 
interest in secrecy.  18 
 19 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 20 
be cited as the “Transparency Is Accountability Amendment Act of 2025”. 21 
Sec. 2. The Freedom of Information Act of 1976 (D.C. Law 1-96; D.C. Official Code § 2-22 
534(a)), is amended as follows: 23 
 (a) Paragraph (a)(2) is amended to read as follows:  24 
 “(2) Information of a personal nature where the public disclosure thereof would constitute 25 
a clearly unwarranted invasion of personal privacy, excluding audio or transcripts of calls to 911 26 
and other 911 radio, including dispatches and agency to agency communications, where the 911 27 
caller’s name and contact information has been redacted; provided, that the agency shall not 28 
redact the personal information of the person requesting the record or a person who has expressly 29 
consented to disclosure of the information in writing.” 30 
 (b) Paragraph (a)(4) is amended to read as follows 31 
 “(4) Inter-agency or intra-agency memorandums or letters, including memorandums or 32   
 
 
2 
letters generated or received by the staff or members of the Council, which would not be 33 
available by law to a party other than a public body in litigation with the public body. This 34 
exemption shall not apply to information regarding government misconduct, including actions, 35 
policies, or decisions that violate the District’s Code of Conduct as defined by Section 101 of the 36 
Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Establishment and Comprehensive Ethics 37 
Reform Amendment Act of 2011 (D.C. Law 19-318; D.C. Official Code § 1–1161.01(7); the 38 
District of Columbia Theft and White Collar Crimes Act of 1982 (D.C. Official Code Title 22, 39 
Chapters 7, 24, 32); the Human Rights Act of 1977 (D.C. Law 2-38; D.C. Official Code §§ 2-40 
1401.01 et seq.); and Mayor’s Order 2023-131 (October 31, 2023) and any superseding order.” 41 
 (c) Subsection (b) is amended by:  42 
 (1) inserting the sentence “An agency shall withhold information under this 43 
section only if the agency reasonably foresees that disclosure would harm an interest protected 44 
by subsection (a).” before the word “Any”; and 45 
 (2) inserting the sentence “An agency shall apply a presumption of openness 46 
when applying this section and shall consider discretionary releases of information when the 47 
reasonable likelihood of significant harm occurring is low and the public interest in the 48 
information is high.” after the phrase “where the deletion was made.” 49 
 (d) A new subsection (f) is inserted to read as follows: 50 
 “(f) Information withheld under the deliberative process privilege shall be disclosed if the 51 
public’s interest in disclosure outweighs the District’s interest in secrecy.”  52 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 53 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 54 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 55   
 
 
3 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 56 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 57 
 This act shall take effect after approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 58 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 59 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 60 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 61 
Columbia Register. 62