District Of Columbia 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B26-0222 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/04/2025

                             
 
 
 
 
 
April 4, 2025 
 
Nyasha Smith, Secretary  
Council of the District of Columbia  
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW  
Washington, D.C. 20004  
 
Dear Secretary Smith,  
 
I am introducing the “Alfred Dudley, Sr. Way Designation 	Act of 2025”. Please see enclosed 
signed copy of the legislation.  
 
This legislation will symbolically designate the 2900 block of Mills Avenue, N.E., in Ward 5, as 
Alfred Dudley, Sr. Way. I previously introduced the Alfred DeGreat Dudley, Sr. Posthumous 
Recognition Resolution of 2023, and I am proud to introduce this legislation with the support of 
his family that will create a permanent memorial to his legacy.  
 
Over the course of his illustrious career, Mr. Alfred DeGreat Dudley, Sr. purchased and became 
President of Dudley Beauty College locat ed at 2031 Rhode Island Avenue, N.E., in Ward 5. 
Dudley Beauty College sits adjacent to the 2900 block of Mills Avenue, N.E. Mr. Dudley, Sr. was 
instrumental in helping many sales representatives, cosmetologists, barbers, and nail 
technologists become successful entrepreneurs, and mentored many as they strove to reach their 
full potential. In 2006, Mr. Dudley, Sr. received the Outstanding Individuals and Organizations 
Award for Demonstrated Leadership in Business given by the Washington, D.C. Chapter of the 
National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. Alfred DeGreat Dudley, Sr. passed 
on May 21, 2023, and leaves a legacy that will live on in the beauty industry and for generations 
to come. 
 
Please feel free to reach out to me or my Legislative Director, Neferteria Brown, with any 
questions or for additional information. She can be reached at nbrown@dccouncil.gov or by 
phone at (771) 333-9734.  
 
 
   
Sincerely,  
 
 
 
 
Zachary Parker  
Ward 5 Councilmember  
Chair, Committee on Youth Affairs  
   
 
1 
 
 1 
  _____________________________ 2 
  Councilmember Zachary Parker 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_________________________ 8 
 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 
 11 
_________________________ 12 
 13 
 14 
To symbolically designate the 2900 block of Mills Avenue , N.E., in Ward 5, as Alfred Dudley, 15 
Sr. Way.  16 
 17 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 18 
be cited as the “Alfred Dudley, Sr. Way Designation Act of 2025”. 19 
 Sec. 2. Pursuant to sections 401, 403a, and 423 of the Street and Alley Closing and 20 
Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 4-201; D.C. Official 21 
Code §§ 9-204.01, 9-204.03a, and 9-204.23), the Council symbolically designates the 2900 22 
block of Mills Avenue , N.E., in Ward 5, as “Alfred Dudley, Sr. Way”. 23 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 24 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 25 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 26 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 27 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 28 
 This act shall take effect after approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 29 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 30 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 31   
 
2 
 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 32 
Columbia Register. 33