Council | 02/14/2025 | Resolution R26-0033, Effective from Feb 04, 2025 Published in DC Register Vol 72 and Page 001462 | ||
Council | 02/04/2025 | Approved with Resolution Number R26-0033 | ||
Council | 02/04/2025 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 01/27/2025 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 01/27/2025 | Committee Mark-up of PR26-0021 | ||
Council | 01/23/2025 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 01/10/2025 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR26-0021 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/07/2025 | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor | ||
Council | 01/06/2025 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |