1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | 26-34 |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | February 4, 2025 |
---|
12 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Condominium |
---|
13 | | - | Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ associations to conduct virtual meetings and clarify voting and quorum requirements for such meetings; to amend section 29- 910 of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow cooperatives to conduct |
---|
14 | | - | remote meetings; and to amend sections 29- 1005.06, 29- 1005.07, and 29- 1008.11(b) of |
---|
15 | | - | the District of Columbia Official Code to allow limited equity cooperatives to conduct remote meetings. |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
18 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2025”. |
---|
19 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) Since the onset of the COVID -19 pandemic, virtual meetings have become |
---|
20 | | - | routine for many District residents and organizations. |
---|
21 | | - | (b) During this time, the Council has repeatedly granted emergency and temporary |
---|
22 | | - | flexibility for condominium and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually without the need to amend their bylaws. |
---|
23 | | - | (c) The most recent extension of such flexibilities to condominium and cooperative |
---|
24 | | - | associations, the Association Meeting Flexibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, effective |
---|
25 | | - | July 19, 2024 (D.C. law 25- 195; 71 DCR 6754), will expire on March 1 , 2025. |
---|
26 | | - | (d) On December 17, 2024, the Council passed a permanent measure, the Fairness and |
---|
27 | | - | Stability in Housing Amendment Act of 2024, enacted on January 16, 2025 ( D.C. Act 25- 694; 72 |
---|
28 | | - | DCR 754), which included these provisions. The measure has not yet completed congressional |
---|
29 | | - | review. |
---|
30 | | - | (e) Emergency legislation is necessary to ensure that all interested associations can |
---|
31 | | - | readily benefit from virtual meeting capabilities. |
---|
32 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances |
---|
33 | | - | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the |
---|
34 | | - | Association Meeting Flexibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2025 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
35 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 1 | + | 1 |
---|
| 2 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 3 | + | 3 |
---|
| 4 | + | 4 |
---|
| 5 | + | 5 |
---|
| 6 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 |
---|
| 7 | + | __________ 7 |
---|
| 8 | + | 8 |
---|
| 9 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 |
---|
| 10 | + | ____________________ 10 |
---|
| 11 | + | 11 |
---|
| 12 | + | To declare an emergency with respect to the need to amend, on an emergency basis, the 12 |
---|
| 13 | + | Condominium Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ associations to 13 |
---|
| 14 | + | conduct virtual meetings and clarify voting and quorum requirements for such meetings; 14 |
---|
| 15 | + | to amend section 29-910 of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow cooperatives 15 |
---|
| 16 | + | to conduct remote meetings; and to amend sections 29-1005.06, 29-1005.07, and 29-16 |
---|
| 17 | + | 1008.11(b) of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow limited equity cooperatives 17 |
---|
| 18 | + | to conduct remote meetings. 18 |
---|
| 19 | + | 19 |
---|
| 20 | + | RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 |
---|
| 21 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Emergency Declaration 21 |
---|
| 22 | + | Resolution of 2025”. 22 |
---|
| 23 | + | Sec. 2. (a) Since the onset of the COVID-19 pandemic, virtual meetings have become 23 |
---|
| 24 | + | routine for many District residents and organizations. 24 |
---|
| 25 | + | (b) During this time, the Council has repeatedly granted emergency and temporary 25 |
---|
| 26 | + | flexibility for condominium and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually 26 |
---|
| 27 | + | without the need to amend their bylaws. 27 |
---|
| 28 | + | (c) The most recent extension of such flexibilities to condominium and cooperative 28 |
---|
| 29 | + | associations, the Association Meeting Flexibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, will 29 |
---|
| 30 | + | expire on March 1, 2024. 30 |
---|
| 31 | + | (d) On December 17, 2024, Council passed a permanent measure, the “Fairness and 31 |
---|
| 32 | + | Stability in Housing Amendment Act of 2024” (B25-418), which included these provisions. The 32 |
---|
| 33 | + | measure has not yet completed congressional review. 33 (e) Emergency legislation is necessary to ensure that all interested associations can 34 |
---|
| 34 | + | readily benefit from virtual meeting capabilities. 35 |
---|
| 35 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 36 |
---|
| 36 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute an emergency making it necessary that the Association 37 |
---|
| 37 | + | Meeting Flexibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2025 be adopted after a single reading. 38 |
---|
| 38 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 39 |
---|