District Of Columbia 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR26-0063 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
1+GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
2+Office of the Attorney General
23
34
45
5-A RESOLUTION
6+A
7+TTORNEY GENERAL
8+BRIAN L. SCHWALB
69
7-26-44
10+February 10, 2025
811
12+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
13+Chairman
14+Council of the District of Columbia
15+John A. Wilson Building
16+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504
17+Washington, DC 20004
18+
19+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
20+
21+Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed
22+emergency legislation, the “Contract No. DCCB-2025-F -0003 with Edelson PC Approval and
23+Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2025” and accompanying emergency declaration
24+resolution (“legislation”) to approve the award of the proposed definitive multiyear Contract Number
25+DCCB-2025-F -0003 to Edelson PC.
26+
27+Under the proposed contract, Edelson PC will assist OAG with an investigation and potential
28+litigation against identified targets for violation of law related to past marketing, selling, and
29+installation of lead water pipes. The Contract is a multi-year contingency fee contract, under which
30+the Contractor will only be compensated if the District realizes a monetary recovery, either through
31+settlement, judgement, or otherwise.
32+The not-to-exceed amount of this contract is $85 million, and
33+the base period of performance is from the date of the award through five years thereafter. This
34+contract will definitize a letter contract awarded on October 21, 2024.
35+
36+
37+If you have any questions , please have your staff contact Interim Deputy Attorney General Sarah
38+Comeau at (202)-724-6611 or at sarah.comeau@dc.gov.
39+
40+I look forward to the Council’s favorable consideration of this contract .
41+
42+Sincerely,
43+
44+Brian L. Schwalb
45+Attorney General
46+
47+Enclosures
48+400 Sixth Street NW, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20001- 5790 | (202) 727- 3400 | Fax (202) 730- 0484 1
49+2
50+3
51+4
52+5
53+6
54+7
55+8
56+9
57+10
58+11
59+12
60+~~~
61+~ fulMendelson
62+at the request
63+of the Attorney General
64+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
965 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
66+13 To declare the existence
67+of an emergency with respect to the need to approve multi year Contract
68+14 No. DCCB-2025-F-0003 with Edelson PC to provide legal services to the Office of the
69+15 Attorney General.
70+16
71+17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
72+18 resolution may be cited as the "Contract No. DCCB-2025-F-0003 with Edelson PC Emergency
73+19 Declaration Resolution of 2025".
74+20 Sec. 2. (a) There exists a need
75+to approve multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2025-F-0003
76+21 with Edelson PC to provide legal services to the Office of the Attorney General for Public
77+22 Advocacy Division matters.
78+23 (b) Because this is a multi year contract and involves expenditures in excess of $1 million
79+24 during a 12-month period, Council approval
80+of this contract is required by section 451 of the
81+25 District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official
82+26
83+Code§ 1-204.51).
84+27 (
85+c) Council approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services.
86+28 Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute
87+29 emergency circumstances making it necessary that the "Contract No. DCCB-2025-F-0003 with
88+30 Edelson PC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2025" be adopted after a
89+31 single reading. Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 32
1090
11-March 4, 2025
12- To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve multiyear Contract
13-No. DCCB- 2025-F-0003 with Edelson PC to provide legal services to the Office of the
14-Attorney General.
15- RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
16-resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. DCCB -2025-F-0003 with Edelson PC Emergency
17-Declaration Resolution of 2025”.
18- Sec. 2. (a) There exists a need to approve multiyear Contract No. DCCB- 2025-F-0003
19-with Edelson PC to provide legal services to the Office of the Attorney General for Public
20-Advocacy Division matter s.
21- (b) Because this is a multiyear contract and involves expenditures in excess of $1 million
22-during a 12- month period, Council approval of this contract is required by section 451 of the
23-District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official
24-Code § 1- 204.51).
25- (c) Council approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services.
26- Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances
27-enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Contract No. DCCB- 2025-F-0003 with Edelson PC Approval and Payment Authorization
28-Emergency Act of 2025 be adopted after a single reading.
29- Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
91+GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
92+Office of the Attorney General
93+
94+
95+ATTORNEY GENERAL
96+BRIAN L. SCHWALB
97+
98+Commercial Division
99+
100+REVISED MEMORANDUM
101+
102+TO: Sarina Loy
103+ Deputy Director
104+
105+
106+Office of Policy and Legislative Affairs
107+FROM: Robert Schildkraut
108+ Section Chief
109+
110+
111+Government Contracts Section
112+DATE:
113+
114+January 29, 2025
115+SUBJECT: Approval of Contract Action for Outside Legal Counsel
116+ Contract Number: DCCB-2025-F-0003
117+ Contractor: Edelson PC
118+ Proposed Contract Amount: NTE $85,000,000 (5-Year Amount)
119+
120+
121+
122+This is to Certify that this Office has reviewed the above-referenced Contract and that we have
123+found it to be legally sufficient.
124+
125+ If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call me at (202) 724- 4018.
126+
127+
128+______________________________
129+ Robert Schildkraut