District Of Columbia 2025-2026 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR26-0153 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
51 1
6-
7-A RESOLUTION
8-
9-26-58
10-
11-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-April 1, 2025
14-
15-To declare an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to amend the
16-Condominium Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ associations to
17-conduct virtual meetings and clarify voting and quorum requirements for such meetings;
18-to amend section 29- 910 of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow cooperatives
19-to conduct remote meetings; and to amend sections 29- 1005.06, 29- 1005.07, and 29-
20-1008.11(b) of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow limited equity cooperatives
21-to conduct remote meetings.
22-
23-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
24-resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review
25-Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2025”.
26-
27-Sec. 2. (a) Since the onset of the COVID -19 pandemic, virtual meetings have become
28-routine for many District residents and organizations.
29-(b) During this time, the Council has repeatedly granted emergency and temporary
30-flexibility for condominium and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually
31-without the need to amend their bylaws.
32-(c) On December 17, 2024, Council passed a permanent measure, the Fairness and
33-Stability in Housing Amendment Act of 2024, enacted on January 16, 2025 (D.C. Act 25- 694; 72
34-DCR 753) (“permanent measure”), which included these provisions. The permanent measure is
35-expected to become law on May 22, 2025.
36-(d) After passing the permanent measure, the Council passed a final round of emergency
37-and temporary legislation with the intent of avoiding a gap in the law. However, the emergency
38-bill will expire on May 14, 2025, and the temporary is expected to become law on May 17, 2025.
39-(e) Congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to ensure that all interested
40-associations can readily benefit from virtual meeting capabilities.
41-
42-Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances
43-enumerated in section 2 constitute an emergency making it necessary that the Association
44-Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2025 be adopted after
45-a single reading. ENROLLED ORIGINAL
46-
47-
48-
49-2
50-
51-
52-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
2+Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2
3+3
4+4
5+5
6+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6
7+__________ 7
8+8
9+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9
10+____________________ 10
11+11
12+To declare an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to amend, on an 12
13+emergency basis, the Condominium Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ 13
14+associations to conduct virtual meetings and clarify voting and quorum requirements for 14
15+such meetings; to amend section 29-910 of the District of Columbia Official Code to 15
16+allow cooperatives to conduct remote meetings; and to amend sections 29-1005.06, 29-16
17+1005.07, and 29-1008.11(b) of the District of Columbia Official Code to allow limited 17
18+equity cooperatives to conduct remote meetings. 18
19+19
20+RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20
21+resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review 21
22+Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2025”. 22
23+Sec. 2. (a) Since the onset of the COVID-19 pandemic, virtual meetings have become 23
24+routine for many District residents and organizations. 24
25+(b) During this time, the Council has repeatedly granted emergency and temporary25
26+flexibility for condominium and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually 26
27+without the need to amend their bylaws. 27
28+(c)On December 17, 2024, Council passed a permanent measure, the “Fairness and28
29+Stability in Housing Amendment Act of 2024” (B ill 25-418), which included these provisions. 29
30+The measure is expected to become effective May 22, 2025. 30
31+(d)After passing Bill 25-418, the Council passed a final round of ordinary emergency31
32+and temporary legislation with the intent of avoiding a gap in the law. However, the emergency 32 bill will expire on May 14, 2025, and the temporary is expected to become effective May 17, 33
33+2025. 34
34+(e) Emergency legislation is necessary to ensure that all interested associations can 35
35+readily benefit from virtual meeting capabilities. 36
36+Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 37
37+enumerated in section 2 constitute an emergency making it necessary that the Association 38
38+Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2025 be adopted after 39
39+a single reading. 40
40+Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 41