06/30/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 16 ABSENT | |||
06/22/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/22/2023 | Amendment SA 2 to HB 120 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/22/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 120 - Stricken in Senate | |||
06/22/2023 | Amendment SA 2 to HB 120 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/20/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 120 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
05/02/2023 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |||
05/02/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
04/26/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 Favorable | |||
04/20/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |