LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB13
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB13
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB13
Action History
09/05/2024
Signed by Governor
06/27/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO
05/21/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
04/18/2024
Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
04/18/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 21 YES 13 NO 7 ABSENT
03/26/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
03/14/2024
Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 13, and Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House