|
09/11/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2023
|
Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 3 NO 1 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
06/29/2023
|
Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING
|
|
|
|
06/29/2023
|
Amendment SA 1 to HB 154 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
|
|
|
|
06/29/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
|
|
|
|
06/28/2023
|
Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
|
|
|
|
06/28/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
|
|
|
|
06/27/2023
|
Amendment SA 1 to HB 154 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
06/08/2023
|
Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate
|
|
|
|
06/08/2023
|
Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
06/08/2023
|
Amendment HA 4 to HB 154 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/08/2023
|
Amendment HA 1 to HB 154 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/07/2023
|
Amendment HA 1 to HB 154 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
06/06/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits
|
|
|
|
05/17/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee (Technology & Telecommunications) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
|
|
|
|
05/12/2023
|
Introduced and Assigned to Technology & Telecommunications Committee in House
|
|
|